Portis v. Williams
Plaintiff: Ricky Portis
Defendant: Warden Jessie Williams
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 2:2020cv00040
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 Filing 9 *RESTRICTED* State Court Record - Habeas by Defendant Jessie Williams Volumes 10 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SCR, Portis, Cause No. 2016-KA-00713-SCT, Case Folder, #2 Exhibit SCR, Portis, Cause No. 2016-KA-00713-SCT, Exhibits, #3 Exhibit SCR, Portis, Cause No. 2016-KA-00713-SCT, Vol. 1, #4 Exhibit SCR, Portis, Cause No. 2016-KA-00713-SCT, Vol. 2, #5 Exhibit SCR, Portis, Cause No. 2016-KA-00713-SCT, Vol. 3, #6 Exhibit SCR, Portis, Cause No. 2016-KA-00713-SCT, Vol. 4, #7 Exhibit SCR, Portis, Cause No. 2016-KA-00713-SCT, Vol. 5, #8 Exhibit SCR, Portis, Cause No. 2016-KA-00713-SCT, Vol. 6, #9 Exhibit SCR, Portis, Cause No. 2016-KA-00713-SCT, Vol. 7, #10 Exhibit SCR, Portis, Cause No. 2019-M-01575, Case Folder)(Burch-State Gov, Emily)
April 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Jessie Williams (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Sentencing Order, #2 Exhibit B-Opinion aff'd by MSSC, #3 Exhibit C-PCR, #4 Exhibit D-MSSC Denial of PCR)(Burch-State Gov, Emily)
April 8, 2020 Filing 7 Domestic Return Receipt showing mail addressed to Lynn Fitch, Office of the Attorney General, was received on 04/03/2020 (Article No.: 7018 0360 0000 2195 3146) (CS)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, Respondent, through the Attorney General of the State of Mississippi, shall file an answer or other responsive pleading in this cause within twenty (20) days of the service upon the said Attorney General of a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 03/30/2020. [Copy of Order mailed to Petitioner] (CS)
March 27, 2020 Filing fee paid: $5.00, receipt number 24643006783 (CS)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER *RESTRICTED* denying #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner has 30 days from the entry of this Order to submit the $5.00 filing fee to the Court. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 03/12/2020. [Copy of Order mailed to Petitioner] (CS)
March 11, 2020 Filing 4 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ricky Portis. (CS)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER, on or before March 27, 2020, Petitioner shall complete and file the attached application OR pay the $5.00 filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 02/26/2020. [Copy of Order mailed to Petitioner] (CS)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Ricky Portis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Order, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) (CS)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Ricky Portis. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Assignment, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) (CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Portis v. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Portis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Jessie Williams
Represented By: Lynn Fitch-State Gov
Represented By: Emily H. Burch-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?