Dykon Explosive Demolition Corp. v. Northstar Demolition and Remediation, L.P.
Plaintiff: Dykon Explosive Demolition Corp.
Defendant: Northstar Demolition and Remediation, L.P.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00070
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2020 Rule 16(a) order mailed to Ross Douglas Vaughn. (KPM)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Counterclaim. Dykon Explosives Demolition Corp.'s answer to counterclaim shall be filed by 6/18/2020. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on June 5, 2020 (KPM)
June 5, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Dykon Explosive Demolition Corp. (Vaughn, Ross)
June 5, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ross Douglas Vaughn on behalf of Dykon Explosive Demolition Corp. (Vaughn, Ross)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Counterclaim. Dykon Explosive Demolition Corp.'s answer to Northstar's counterclaim due 6/8/2020. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on May 15, 2020 (KPM)
May 15, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Dykon Explosive Demolition Corp. (Ellis, David)
May 8, 2020 Filing 8 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 6/18/2020 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 6/12/20. (KPM)
May 4, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Dykon Explosive Demolition Corp. by Northstar Demolition and Remediation, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SUBCONTRACT)(Copeland, Clyde)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Northstar Demolition and Remediation, L.P. answer due 5/4/2020. No further written order shall issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on April 24, 2020. (MMc)
April 24, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Northstar Demolition and Remediation, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time)(Keup, Morgan)
April 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Intent to Withdraw Motion to Dismiss by Northstar Demolition and Remediation, L.P. re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the Alternative, for Transfer of Venue MOTION to Change Venue (Keup, Morgan)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the Alternative, for Transfer of Venue filed by Northstar Demolition and Remediation, L.P. Response due 4/29/20; reply due 5/6/20. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 4/16/20. (cb)
April 15, 2020 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the Alternative, for Transfer of Venue filed by Northstar Demolition and Remediation, L.P. (Copeland, Clyde)
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the Alternative, for Transfer of Venue by Northstar Demolition and Remediation, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lamar County Complaint, #2 Exhibit Subcontract Agreement)(Copeland, Clyde). Added MOTION to Change Venue on 4/16/2020 (LDR).
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Northstar Demolition and Remediation, L.P. from Circuit Court of Lamar County, Mississippi, case number 37:20CV021. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-4249890) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-State Court File, #3 Exhibit B-Service Packet, #4 Exhibit C-Northstar Secretary of State 2019 Corporate Annual Report) (CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dykon Explosive Demolition Corp. v. Northstar Demolition and Remediation, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dykon Explosive Demolition Corp.
Represented By: David B. Ellis
Represented By: Ross Douglas Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northstar Demolition and Remediation, L.P.
Represented By: Clyde X. Copeland, III
Represented By: Morgan M. Keup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?