Bryant v. Selective Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Tina Bryant
Defendant: Selective Insurance Company of America and Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast
Case Number: 2:2020cv00140
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:4001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Reset Hearings: Telephonic Case Management Conference reset for 10/28/2020 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 10/23/20. (KPM)
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2020 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 10/23/20. (KPM)
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast identifying Corporate Parent Selective Insurance Group, Inc. for Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast. (Demosthenidy, Laurent)
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast.(Demosthenidy, Laurent)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AGREED ORDER SUBSTITUTING THE PROPER DEFENDANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on September 10, 2020 (KPM)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast answer due 9/22/2020. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on September 2, 2020 (KPM)
September 2, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #4 : Wrong Division listed. Attorney is directed to correct the error in future filings to read "Eastern Division". (LDR)
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast (Demosthenidy, Laurent)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tina Bryant. Selective Insurance Company of America served on 8/17/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Domestic Return Receipt)(Hicks, Clark)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Selective Insurance Company of America. (CS)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Selective Insurance Company of America (Filing fee $400 receipt number 24643007016), filed by Tina Bryant. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant v. Selective Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selective Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast
Represented By: Laurent J. Demosthenidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Bryant
Represented By: Clark Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?