Sanders v. Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan
Plaintiff: Betty Sanders
Defendant: Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan
Case Number: 2:2020cv00142
Filed: August 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Betty Sanders (McWherter, J.)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. T. Joseph Snodgrass is hereby admitted pro hac vice upon registering for electronic filing. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on September 8, 2020 (KPM)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for T. Joseph Snodgrass to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4364681) by Betty Sanders (Attachments: #1 Attachment A. Bar Admissions, #2 Attachment B. MS Pro Hac Admissions, #3 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(McWherter, J.)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by William F. Ray on behalf of Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan (Ray, William)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Betty Sanders. Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan waiver sent on 8/26/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (McWherter, J.)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Erik D. Peterson is hereby admitted pro hac vice upon registering for electronic filing. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on August 7, 2020 (KPM)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Erik D. Peterson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4340990) by Betty Sanders (Attachments: #1 Attachment KY Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing)(McWherter, J.)
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan. (CS)
August 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-4334785), filed by Betty Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Sanders
Represented By: J. Brandon McWherter
Represented By: T. Joseph Snodgrass - PHV
Represented By: Erik D. Peterson - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan
Represented By: William F. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?