Ronnie Louis Marvel Kahapea v. PennyMac Loan Services, LLC et al
Petitioner: Ronnie Louis Marvel Kahapea
Respondent: PennyMac Loan Services, LLC and Plaza Home Mortgage
Case Number: 2:2020cv00151
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9 U.S.C. ยง 9
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER setting briefing schedule re #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter) filed by Plaza Home Mortgage Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 9/22/2020 (lm)
September 18, 2020 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM in Support re #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter) filed by Plaza Home Mortgage (Bobo, Robert)
September 18, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Subject Matter) by Plaza Home Mortgage (Bobo, Robert)
September 14, 2020 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter)(Powers, Harris)
September 10, 2020 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC (Powers, Harris)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #34 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #35 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #36 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Nicole Metral, Cheryl Chang, and Jessica A. McElroy are hereby admitted pro hac vice upon registering for electronic filing. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on September 10, 2020 (KPM)
September 9, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION for Jessica A. McElroy to Appear Pro Hac Vice by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC (Powers, Harris)
September 9, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for Cheryl Chang to Appear Pro Hac Vice by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC (Powers, Harris)
September 9, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION for Nicole Metral to Appear Pro Hac Vice by PennyMac Loan Services, LLC (Powers, Harris)
September 9, 2020 Pro Hac Vice fee paid for Nicole B. Metral receipt number 0538-4367711 $ 100 (Powers, Harris)
September 9, 2020 Pro Hac Vice fee paid for Cheryl S. Chang receipt number 0538-4367719 $ 100 (Powers, Harris)
September 9, 2020 Pro Hac Vice fee paid for Jessica A. McElroy receipt number 0538-4367721 $ 100 (Powers, Harris)
September 3, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Sheldon Givens Alston on behalf of Plaza Home Mortgage (Alston, Sheldon)
September 2, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven C. Cookston on behalf of PennyMac Loan Services, LLC (Cookston, Steven)
September 2, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Harris Frederick Powers, III on behalf of PennyMac Loan Services, LLC (Powers, Harris)
August 31, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Lane Bobo on behalf of Plaza Home Mortgage (Bobo, Robert)
August 13, 2020 Filing 29 Letters to Cheryl S. Chang, Jessica A. McElroy, John K. Ly and Nicole Bartz Metral from Katherine Alexander re Attorney Admissions. (CS)
August 13, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven C. Cookston on behalf of PennyMac Loan Services, LLC (Cookston, Steven)
August 13, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Harris Frederick Powers, III on behalf of PennyMac Loan Services, LLC (Powers, Harris)
August 13, 2020 Filing 26 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:20-cv-05195. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Respondent's Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue #11 is granted in part and denied in part. The Clerk shall transfer this case forthwith to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi. Case transferred electronically. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 8/13/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 24 JOINDER in to Compel Arbitration #3 To Respondent PennyMac's Oppposition to Petitioner's Judicial Notice and Demand filed by Respondent Plaza Home Mortgage. (Ly, John) [Transferred from California Central on 8/13/2020.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 23 OBJECTIONS to Request for Judicial Notice #21 filed by Respondent PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Metral, Nicole) [Transferred from California Central on 8/13/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY MEMORANDUM filed by Petitioner Ronnie Louis Marvel Kahapea. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 8/13/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Respondent Plaza Home Mortgage (Ly, John) [Transferred from California Central on 8/13/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Respondent Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc. Plaza Home Mortgage, re Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #16 , Joinder (Motion Related) #18 , Request for Judicial Notice #17 and Corporate Disclosure served on July 30, 2020. (Ly, John) [Transferred from California Central on 8/13/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 18 JOINDER in to Compel Arbitration #3 To PennyMac Loan Services, LLC's Opposition to Motion to Confirm Arbitration filed by Respondent Plaza Home Mortgage. (Ly, John) [Transferred from California Central on 8/13/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re to Compel Arbitration #3 In Support of Opposition to Motion to Confirm Arbitration filed by Respondent Plaza Home Mortgage. (Ly, John) [Transferred from California Central on 8/13/2020.]
July 30, 2020 Filing 16 Respondent Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc.'s Opposition to Petitioner's Motiont to Confirm Arbitration Award Opposition re: to Compel Arbitration #3 filed by Respondent Plaza Home Mortgage. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Michael R. Fontaine)(Attorney John K Ly added to party Plaza Home Mortgage(pty:res))(Ly, John) [Transferred from California Central on 8/13/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The hearing on petitioner's Motion is set for August 20, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 8/13/2020.]
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 10/1/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr) [Transferred from California Central on 8/13/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #11 filed by Respondent PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Metral, Nicole) [Transferred from California Central on 8/13/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Nicole B. Metral in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #11 filed by Respondent PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Metral, Nicole) [Transferred from California Central on 8/13/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by respondent PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 8/20/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order) (Metral, Nicole) [Transferred from California Central on 8/13/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(B), or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by Respondent PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Metral, Nicole) [Transferred from California Central on 8/13/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Respondent PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, identifying PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, Respondent; Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc., Respondent; Ronnie Kahapea, Petitioner; Private National Mortgage Acceptance Company, LLC ("PNMAC"), Ownership interest in PennyMac; PennyMac Financial Services, Inc. ("PFSI"), Ownership interest in PNMAC; PNMAC Holdings, Inc., Ownership interest in PNMAC; BlackRock, Inc., Ownership interest in PFSI. (Attorney Nicole Bartz Metral added to party PennyMac Loan Services, LLC(pty:res))(Metral, Nicole) [Transferred from California Central on 8/13/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Respondent PennyMac Loan Services, LLC's Opposition to Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Respondent PennyMac Loan Services, LLC re: Objection #7 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Metral, Nicole) [Transferred from California Central on 8/13/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 OBJECTIONS to Petition (case opening) #3 - Respondent PennyMac Loan Services, LLC's Opposition to Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Respondent PennyMac Loan Services, LLC. (Metral, Nicole) [Transferred from California Central on 8/13/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 21 JUDICIAL NOTICE #3 AND DEMAND filed by Petitioner Ronnie Louis Marvel Kahapea. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 8/13/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 8/13/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 8/13/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 8/13/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD filed against PennyMac Loan Services, LLC, Plaza Home Mortgage (Filing fee $ 400 PAID), filed by Petitioner Ronnie Louis Marvel Kahapea. (car) Modified on 7/22/2020 (vdr). [Transferred from California Central on 8/13/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $400.00 from Ronnie Louis Marvel Kahapea. Re: Notice Re: Discrepancies with Lodging of Complaint (CV-47), #1 . Receipt number LA208139. (fr) [Transferred from California Central on 8/13/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE RE: DISCREPANCIES WITH LODGING OF COMPLAINT mailed to Petitioner Ronnie Louis Marvel Kahapea. Upon submission of your complaint, the following discrepancy was found: You have not submitted the entire filing fee amount of $400. If you are unable to pay the entire filing fee at this time, you may request that the fee be waived. To do so, you must complete, sign, and return the enclose form, Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60), in its entirety. If you do not respond within THIRTY DAYS from the date below, your your action will be dismissed. If your fee waiver request or payment is received within THIRTY DAYS, judges will be assigned to your case. You may return your fee waiver request or payment to any of the Courthouses listed on this notice. Re Lodged Complaint (Attachments: #1 CV-60 Form) (car) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2020: #2 Lodged Complaint) (car). [Transferred from California Central on 8/13/2020.]
June 11, 2020 LODGED COMPLAINT sought to be filed by Petitioner Ronnie Louis Marvel Kahapea. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 8/13/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ronnie Louis Marvel Kahapea v. PennyMac Loan Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: PennyMac Loan Services, LLC
Represented By: Nicole Bartz Metral
Represented By: Harris Frederick Powers, III
Represented By: Steven C. Cookston
Represented By: Jessica A McElroy
Represented By: Cheryl S Chang
Represented By: Cheryl S. Chang - PHV
Represented By: Jessica A. McElroy - PHV
Represented By: Nicole B. Metral - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Plaza Home Mortgage
Represented By: John K Ly
Represented By: Sheldon Givens Alston
Represented By: Robert Lane Bobo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ronnie Louis Marvel Kahapea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?