Brumfield v. Harris et al
Plaintiff: James J. Brumfield
Defendant: Judge Taylor, Vernon E. Alford, Barry Dillion and Johnathan Harris
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 2:2020cv00161
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Change of Address by James J. Brumfield: Marion Walthall County Jail, 503 South Main Street, Columbia, MS 39429. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CS)
October 9, 2020 Filing 14 Letter from James J. Brumfield requesting for documents filed in Walthall County Circuit Court. (Attachments: #1 Various Documents, #2 Envelope) (CS)
October 5, 2020 Filing 13 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to NEF of documents #8 , #9 , #10 . Mail sent to James J. Brumfield to last known address on record. (CS)
October 5, 2020 Filing 12 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to NEF of #7 Authorization for Release of Account Information and Certificate. Mail sent to James J. Brumfield to last known address on record. (CS)
September 24, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by James J. Brumfield #43720, Lamar County Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 806, Purvis, MS 39475. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CS)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #3 Order Opsp2. Acknowledgement filed by James J. Brumfield. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CS)
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 AUTHORIZATION FOR RELEASE OF ACCOUNT INFORMATION AND CERTIFICATE by James J. Brumfield. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CS)
September 23, 2020 Filing 8 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by James J. Brumfield. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CS)
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 AUTHORIZATION FOR RELEASE OF ACCOUNT INFORMATION AND CERTIFICATE by James J. Brumfield. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CS)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 Clerk's memo in response to Plaintiff's #5 Letter. (CS)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 Letter from James J. Brumfield re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CS)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: on or before 10/1/2020, plaintiff shall either pay the required filing fee or file a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 09/01/2020. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed to Plaintiff. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 10/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 09/01/2020. (CS)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by James J. Brumfield. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CS)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Vernon E. Alford, Barry Dillion, Johnathan Harris, Taylor, filed by James J. Brumfield. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Notice of Assignment, #3 Envelope) (CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brumfield v. Harris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernon E. Alford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Dillion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnathan Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James J. Brumfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?