Wallace v. Lamar County Jail Workers et al
Plaintiff: Adam Brent Wallace
Defendant: Medical Doctor John Doe, Lamar County Jail Workers, Lamar County, Nurse Jane Doe and David Rigel
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 2:2020cv00162
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, on or before November 4, 2020, Plaintiff must file a written response consistent with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 10/13/2020. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, Plaintiff's request to voluntarily dismiss Defendants Lamar County Jail Workers, Lamar County, Nurse Jane Doe, and Medical Doctor John Doe is granted. Clerk is directed to add as a Defendant David Rigel, Sheriff of Lamar County, Mississippi. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 10/08/2020. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS)
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 Response to #8 ORDER filed by Adam Brent Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CS)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, on or before October 8, 2020, Plaintiff shall file a written response consistent with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 09/15/2020. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 09/15/2020. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff and Premier SupplyLink for MDOC Inmate Accounts] (CS)
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 AUTHORIZATION FOR RELEASE OF ACCOUNT INFORMATION AND CERTIFICATE by Adam Brent Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CS)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #3 Order Opsp2. Acknowledgement filed by Adam Brent Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CS)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: on or before 9/30/2020, plaintiff shall either pay the required filing fee or file a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 08/31/2020. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed to Plaintiff. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 9/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 08/31/2020. (CS)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Adam Brent Wallace. (Attachments: #1 SMCI Resident Activity Report, #2 Envelope) (CS)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jane Doe, John Doe, Lamar County, Lamar County Jail Workers, filed by Adam Brent Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Assignment, #2 Envelope) (CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. Lamar County Jail Workers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Doctor John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamar County Jail Workers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamar County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Rigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Brent Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?