Magee et al v. Noe et al
Plaintiff: Jamyra Magee and Christopher Magee
Defendant: Michael R. Noe doing business as On Time Shipping and James L. Hilliard
Intervenor Plaintiff: UPS and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00183
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by James L. Hilliard, Michael R. Noe (Mink, Robert)
November 25, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Christopher Magee, Jamyra Magee (Nelson, Ned)
November 25, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Christopher Magee, Jamyra Magee (Nelson, Ned)
November 24, 2020 Rule 16(a) order e-mailed to Jill R. Miller (KPM)
November 24, 2020 Filing 11 Intervenor COMPLAINT OF INTERVENTION, filed by UPS and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Miller, Jill)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Intervene. UPS and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company shall file their Complaint of Intervention on or before December 1, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 11/24/2020. (LDR)
November 6, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Intervene as a Right by UPS and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint of Intervention)(Miller, Jill)
November 4, 2020 Filing 8 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2020 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 11/30/20. (KPM)
October 21, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Michael R. Noe.(Mink, Robert)
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Magee, Jamyra Magee. James L. Hilliard served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Nelson, Mark)
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Magee, Jamyra Magee. Michael R. Noe served on 9/30/2020, answer due 10/21/2020. (Nelson, Mark)
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John G. Jones on behalf of Christopher Magee, Jamyra Magee (Jones, John)
September 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Ned Andrew Nelson on behalf of Christopher Magee, Jamyra Magee (Nelson, Ned)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to James L. Hilliard, Michael R. Noe. (LDR)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James L. Hilliard, Michael R. Noe (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4383253), filed by Christopher Magee, Jamyra Magee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Magee et al v. Noe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R. Noe doing business as On Time Shipping
Represented By: Robert S. Mink, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L. Hilliard
Represented By: Robert S. Mink, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamyra Magee
Represented By: Mark A. Nelson
Represented By: Ned Andrew Nelson
Represented By: John G. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Magee
Represented By: Mark A. Nelson
Represented By: Ned Andrew Nelson
Represented By: John G. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: UPS and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Jill R. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?