Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc. v. Innovated Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc.
Defendant: Innovated Holdings, Inc. doing business as SITCOMM Arbitration Association, Rance Magee, Ronnie Kahapea, Kirk Gibbs, Mark Moffett, Brett Eeon Jones and Sandra Goulette
Case Number: 2:2021cv00038
Filed: March 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Halil S Ozerden
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2021 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #28 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc. (Bobo, Robert)
May 14, 2021 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #28 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc. (Bobo, Robert)
May 7, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Brett Eeon Jones. Filing fee $505, receipt number 24643007497. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CS)
May 7, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment, MOTION to Dismiss Counter Defendant's Complaint in Totality by Brett Eeon Jones. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CS)
May 7, 2021 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Support re #26 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Mark Moffett, Sandra Goulette, Ronnie Kahapea and Rance Magee filed by Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc. (Bobo, Robert)
May 7, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Mark Moffett, Sandra Goulette, Ronnie Kahapea and Rance Magee by Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc. (Bobo, Robert)
May 4, 2021 Filing 25 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT against defendants Sandra Goulette, Ronnie Kahapea, Rance Magee, and Mark Moffett. (ASJ)
May 3, 2021 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc. (Bobo, Robert)
May 3, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #20 , #21 , #22 , #23 : Incorrect event chosen. This document should have been docketed as a Motion for Entry of Default. Court staff has revised docket entry to reflect correct event. (CS)
April 30, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Rance Magee by Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit in Support of Clerk's Entry of Default)(Bobo, Robert) Modified on 5/3/2021 (CS).
April 30, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Mark Moffett by Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit in Support of Clerk's Entry of Default)(Bobo, Robert) Modified on 5/3/2021 (CS).
April 30, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Ronnie Kahapea by Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit in Support of Clerk's Entry of Default)(Bobo, Robert) Modified on 5/3/2021 (CS).
April 30, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Sandra Goulette by Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit in Support of Clerk's Entry of Default)(Bobo, Robert) Modified on 5/3/2021 (CS).
April 29, 2021 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION to Strike #10 Remark filed by Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc. (Bobo, Robert)
April 29, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Strike #10 Remark by Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - USDC Memorandum Opinion and Order)(Bobo, Robert)
April 27, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc.. Innovated Holdings, Inc. served on 4/26/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - USPS Tracking Info)(Bobo, Robert)
April 23, 2021 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc. (Bobo, Robert)
April 23, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2021-03-16 Letter, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Kirk Gibbs' Motion to Appoint Counsel, #3 Exhibit C - Memo in Support of RIO to Motion to Appoint Counsel, #4 Exhibit D - Order Denying Motion to Appoint Counsel)(Bobo, Robert)
April 20, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address by Brett Eeon Jones: 304 S. Jones Blvd., Ste Eeon 1967, Las Vegas, Nevada 89107. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LDR)
April 19, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Reissued as to Innovated Holdings, Inc.. (LDR)
April 19, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc. as to Innovated Holdings, Inc.. (Bobo, Robert)
April 16, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, MOTION to Compel Arbitration, by Brett Eeon Jones. (LDR)
April 16, 2021 Filing 10 Challenge to Courts Jurisdiction, filed by Brett Eeon Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet for Innovated Holdings v. Plaza Home Mortgage, #2 Envelope) (LDR)
April 9, 2021 Filing 9 (Unsigned) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Kirk Gibbs. (Attachments: #1 Financial Affidavit, #2 USDC-Virginia, Order to Show Cause, #3 Envelope)(LDR)
April 5, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc.. Sandra Goulette served on 3/29/2021, answer due 4/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Invoice for Service)(Bobo, Robert)
April 5, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc.. Mark Moffett served on 3/29/2021, answer due 4/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Invoice for Service)(Bobo, Robert)
April 2, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc.. Rance Magee served on 4/1/2021, answer due 4/22/2021. (Bobo, Robert)
April 2, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc.. Kirk Gibbs served on 3/29/2021, answer due 4/19/2021. (Bobo, Robert)
April 2, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc.. Ronnie Kahapea served on 4/1/2021, answer due 4/22/2021. (Bobo, Robert)
March 24, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kirk Gibbs, Sandra Goulette, Innovated Holdings, Inc., Brett Eeon Jones, Ronnie Kahapea, Rance Magee, Mark Moffett. (LDR)
March 19, 2021 Filing 2 ATTACHMENT re #1 Complaint, Exhibit B - Final Arbitration Award by Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc. (Bobo, Robert)
March 19, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #1 : PDF Corrupt/Illegible. PDF attached as Exhibit B contains several illegible pages. Attorney is advised to correct the error by refiling Exhibit B using the event Attachment and link it to the Complaint. (LDR)
March 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kirk Gibbs, Sandra Goulette, Innovated Holdings, Inc., Brett Eeon Jones, Ronnie Kahapea, Rance Magee, Mark Moffett ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0538-4509701), filed by Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Conditional Acceptance, #3 Exhibit B - Final Arbitration Award)(LDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc. v. Innovated Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovated Holdings, Inc. doing business as SITCOMM Arbitration Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rance Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Kahapea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Moffett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Eeon Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Goulette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Lane Bobo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?