Knight v. CBC Recovery, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jessica Knight
Defendant: CBC Recovery, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00109
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Taylor B McNeel
Referring Judge: Robert P Myers
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Hiawatha Northington, II on behalf of CBC Recovery, Inc. (Northington, Hiawatha)
September 24, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica Knight. CBC Recovery, Inc. served on 9/2/2021, answer due 9/23/2021. (Robertson - PHV, Angie) Modified on 9/24/2021 (LDR).
September 24, 2021 Filing 6 **ERROR, DISREGARD THIS ENTRY** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica Knight. CBC Recovery, Inc. served on 9/2/2021, answer due 9/23/2021. (Philipps - PHV, David) Modified on 9/24/2021 (LDR).
September 24, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #6 : Attorney advises that there is an error in this entry, and it should be disregarded. It has been correctly refiled as Doc. #7 . Doc #7 was modified to reflect answer deadline. (LDR)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert P. Myers, Jr on August 20, 2021 (King, Steve)
August 20, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #4 : Incorrect event chosen. This document should have been docketed as a Notice of Appearance. Court staff has revised the docket entry to reflect correct event and terminated the motion created. (CS)
August 18, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #3 : Docket text modified to reflect Angie K. Robertson as pro hac applicant. (LDR)
August 17, 2021 Filing 4 **ERROR DISREGARD THIS ENTRY** MOTION to Appoint Counsel Appearance of Counsel by Jessica Knight (Woods, Edwin) Modified on 8/20/2021 (CS).
August 17, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Angie K. Robertson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number AMSSDC-4635549) by Jessica Knight (Attachments: #1 Attachment Good Standing)(Woods, Edwin) Modified on 8/18/2021 (LDR).
August 17, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CBC Recovery, Inc.. (LDR)
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CBC Recovery, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSSDC-4634467), filed by Jessica Knight. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(LDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knight v. CBC Recovery, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Knight
Represented By: Edwin Woods, Jr.
Represented By: Angie K. Robertson - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBC Recovery, Inc.
Represented By: Hiawatha Northington, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?