Anthony et al v. Dubay et al
Plaintiff: Joe Anthony and Patty Anthony
Defendant: John Gordan Dubay, II, Robert David Dubay and June Faircloth
Case Number: 2:2022cv00026
Filed: March 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Service of Objections and Response to Request for Production by John Gordan Dubay, II, Robert David Dubay, June Faircloth (Ros, J.)
July 28, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Service of Guardians/Conservators Response to Interrogatories by Robert David Dubay, June Faircloth (Ros, J.)
July 28, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Service of Response to Interrogatories by John Gordan Dubay, II (Ros, J.)
July 28, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Service of Objections and Response to Request for Admissions by John Gordan Dubay, II, Robert David Dubay, June Faircloth (Ros, J.)
July 27, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Disclosure by John Gordan Dubay, II, Robert David Dubay, June Faircloth (Ros, J.)
June 29, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories Propounded to Guardians/Conservators Interrogatories by Joe Anthony, Patty Anthony (Harlow, Eugene)
June 29, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service of First Set of Interrogatories by Joe Anthony, Patty Anthony (Harlow, Eugene)
June 29, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Service of First Set of Request for Production by Joe Anthony, Patty Anthony (Harlow, Eugene)
June 29, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Service of First Set of Request for Admissions by Joe Anthony, Patty Anthony (Harlow, Eugene)
May 11, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Reeve G. Jacobus, Jr on behalf of Joe Anthony, Patty Anthony (Jacobus, Reeve)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: The parties do not consent; Jury Trial set for a two week term beginning 6/5/2023 before District Judge Keith Starrett; ETT: 4-5 days; Pretrial Conference set for 5/25/2023 before District Judge Keith Starrett; Discovery due by 1/9/2023; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 6/8/2022; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 6/8/2022; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 10/3/2022; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 11/3/2022; Motions due by 1/23/2023; ADR Report due by 5/18/2023; ADR to be completed by discovery deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on May 9, 2022 (KPM)
May 9, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 5/9/2022. A case management order will be entered. PARTICIPANTS: Gene Harlow and Chris McDaniel for plaintiffs; Henry Ros for defendants. (KPM)
May 4, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Service of Voluntary Disclosure by John Gordan Dubay, II (Ros, J.)
May 2, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Service of Pre-Discovery Disclosure by Joe Anthony, Patty Anthony (McDaniel, Chris)
April 19, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric T. Granberry on behalf of All Defendants (Granberry, Eric)
April 19, 2022 Reset Hearings: Telephonic Case Management Conference reset for 5/9/2022 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 5/4/22. (KPM)
April 7, 2022 Filing 4 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 5/11/2022 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 1.888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 5/5/22. (KPM)
March 23, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Joe Anthony, Patty Anthony.(McDaniel, Chris)
March 4, 2022 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by June Faircloth, Robert David Dubay, John Gordan Dubay, II.(Ros, J.) Modified on 3/4/2022 (LDR).
March 3, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by John Gordan Dubay, II, Robert David Dubay, June Faircloth from Circuit Court of Jones County, Mississippi, case number 34CI2:22-cv-00035. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSSDC-4781302) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 A - State Court Record)(LDR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anthony et al v. Dubay et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Anthony
Represented By: Eugene M. Harlow
Represented By: Chris B. McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patty Anthony
Represented By: Eugene M. Harlow
Represented By: Chris B. McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Gordan Dubay, II
Represented By: J. Henry Ros
Represented By: Eric T. Granberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert David Dubay
Represented By: J. Henry Ros
Represented By: Eric T. Granberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: June Faircloth
Represented By: J. Henry Ros
Represented By: Eric T. Granberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?