Deakle et al v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Plaintiff: Craig Deakle and Jill Deakle
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Myesha Cade, Jason Morgan and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2022cv00160
Filed: November 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael T Parker
Referring Judge: Keith Starrett
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2023 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Myesha Cade, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (DeLashmet, W.)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Craig Deakle, Jill Deakle Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 1/6/2023 (jrg)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER staying discovery and disclosure requirements pending a ruling on the motion to remand and cancelling case management conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on January 5, 2022 (KPM)
January 5, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Craig Deakle, Jill Deakle (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation of Damages)(Johnson, Ronald)
January 5, 2023 ***Hearings terminated (1/26/23 TCMC). (KPM)
January 4, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith B. Franklin on behalf of Myesha Cade, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Franklin, Keith)
January 3, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA by Myesha Cade, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Attachments: #1 Attachment NPS - Beaumont Family Health Center, #2 Attachment NPS - BCBS of MS, #3 Attachment NPS - Ambetter, #4 Attachment NPS - Ambetter, #5 Attachment NPS - Wesley Primary Care of Hattiesburg - Merit Health Medical Group Wesley, #6 Attachment NPS - Family Care Clinic, #7 Attachment NPS - New Augusta Family Health Center, #8 Attachment NPS - Open Air MRI - Laurel, #9 Attachment NPS - Slidell Memorial Hospital, #10 Attachment NPS - Oschner Clinic Foundation - Oschner Medical Center North Shore, #11 Attachment NPS - Southern Neurologic & Spinal Institute, #12 Attachment NPS - Diagnostic Services - Diagnostic Imaging Services)(DeLashmet, W.)
December 23, 2022 Filing 9 ***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY***Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/26/2023 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 1/19/23. (KPM) Modified on 12/23/2022 (KPM).
December 23, 2022 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #9: this document was filed in the wrong case and should be disregarded. (KPM)
December 22, 2022 Filing 8 Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/26/2023 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 1/19/23. (KPM)
December 22, 2022 Filing 7 ***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY***Rule 16(a) Initial Order: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/26/2023 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker. Counsel shall dial 888.273.3658, code 1055457 to connect to the call. Confidential settlement memoranda are due on or before 1/19/23. (KPM) Modified on 12/22/2022 (KPM).
December 22, 2022 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #7: this entry contains a typographical error and should be disregarded. Document #8 replaces the disregarded entry. (KPM)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AGREED ORDER of Dismissal without prejudice as to defendant Jason Morgan. Jason Morgan terminated. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 12/2/2022. (LDR)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Jason Morgan MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jason Morgan, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Myesha Cade Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 11/23/2022 (jrg)
November 22, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Myesha Cade, Jason Morgan, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (DeLashmet, W.)
November 22, 2022 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #2 : Multiple motions filed under one motion event. This document requests several motion reliefs. Every motion relief should be selected from the list of motion titles or each relief docketed separately. The same PDF document may be used for all motion filing entries. It is not necessary to refile as court staff has made the necessary correction. Attorney is advised to follow this procedure in future filings. (LDR)
November 21, 2022 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Jason Morgan filed by Myesha Cade, Jason Morgan, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (DeLashmet, W.)
November 21, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss Jason Morgan by Myesha Cade, Jason Morgan, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Myesha Cade)(DeLashmet, W.). Added MOTION for Summary Judgment on 11/22/2022 (LDR).
November 21, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Myesha Cade, Jason Morgan, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP from Circuit Court of Forrest County, Mississippi, case number 18CI1:22-CV-00119. (Filing fee $402 receipt number AMSSDC-4987756) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-State Court File, #3 Exhibit B-Complaint, #4 Exhibit C-Affidavit of Myesha Cade, #5 Exhibit D-Plaintiff Craig Deakle's Responses to Walmart's First Set, #6 Exhibit E-Plaintiff's Combined Discovery to Defendant) (CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deakle et al v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Deakle
Represented By: Ronald V. Johnson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Deakle
Represented By: Ronald V. Johnson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: W. Pemble DeLashmet
Represented By: Keith B. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myesha Cade
Represented By: W. Pemble DeLashmet
Represented By: Keith B. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Morgan
Represented By: W. Pemble DeLashmet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?