Jackson Women's Health Organization et al v. Currier et al Featured Case

Jackson Women's Health Organization, the sole abortion provider in the State of Mississippi since 2002, and Dr. Willie Parker challenged Mississippi House Bill 1390, alleging that it would "effectively ban abortion in the State oF Mississippi by imposing medically unjustified requirements on physicians who provide abortions." That law required that "all physicians 'associated with an abortion facility must be board certified or eligible in obstetrics and gynecology.'" Furthermore such physicians "must have admitting privileges at a local hospital and staff privileges to replace local hospital on-staff physicians."

Plaintiff: Jackson Women's Health Organization and Willie Parker
Defendant: Mary Currier, Robert Shuler Smith, Barbara A. Bluntson and Sherri M. Flowers-Billlups
Amicus: Office of the Governor
Case Number: 3:2012cv00436
Filed: June 27, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Jackson Office
County: Hinds
Presiding Judge: F. Keith Ball
Presiding Judge: Daniel P. Jordan
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2012 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Memorandum re 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, 19 Memorandum in Support SUPPLEMENTAL filed by Mary Currier, Robert Shuler Smith (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Administrative Procedures Filing Notice)(Googe, P.)
July 11, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III: Motion Hearing held on July 11, 2012 re 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Willie Parker, Jackson Women's Health Organization. Court Reporter Gina Morris (601) 608-4187. (SP)
July 9, 2012 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Office of the Governor (Wilson, Jack)
July 9, 2012 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Jackson Women's Health Organization, Willie Parker (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of Ms. Brewer-Anderson, # 2 Affidavit Rebuttal Declaration of Dr. Grossman, # 3 Affidavit Rebuttal Declaration of Dr. Matthias)(Movahed, Michelle)
July 9, 2012 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Memorandum re 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, 19 Memorandum in Support filed by Mary Currier, Robert Shuler Smith (Bryant, Benjamin)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 21 Motion for Leave to File. The Office of the Governor is directed to file the proposed Amicus Curiae Memorandum of record on or before July 11, 2012. No further written order shall issue. Signed by District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on July 9, 2012. (ddi)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice that Jenna Gerry be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Jackson's Women Health Organization in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 7/9/12. (JEJ)
July 6, 2012 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Memorandum by Office of the Governor (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Wilson, Jack)
July 6, 2012 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Mary Currier, Robert Shuler Smith (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Exhibit A-Affidavit of Dr. John Thorp, # 2 Affidavit Exhibit B-Affidavit of Dr. James Anderson, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C-Alabama Department of Public Health News Release, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D-Alabama Department of Public Health Inspection Reports, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E-Consent Order and Agreement, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F-State Court Complaint of Joseph Booker, # 7 Affidavit Exhibit G-Affidavit of Michael Lucius, # 8 Affidavit Exhibit H-Affidavit of Vann Craig, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit I-Renewed JWHO License)(Bryant, Benjamin)
July 6, 2012 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Jackson Women's Health Organization, Willie Parker (Movahed, Michelle)
July 3, 2012 Pro Hac Vice fee paid by (Jeanna Gerry) $ 100, receipt number 34643016553 (cwl)
July 2, 2012 Filing 18 MOTION for Jenna Gerry to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jackson Women's Health Organization, Willie Parker (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(McDuff, Robert)
July 2, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Motion Hearing for a preliminary injunction is set for July 11, 2012 at 1:00 PM before District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III. (SP)
July 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 5 Motion for TRO for the reasons set out in the order. Plaintiffs motion for a preliminary injunction in this matter will be heard by this Court on July 11, 2012 at 1:00. This Temporary Restraining Order shall remain in effect through the hearing on Plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction. The parties are ordered to file briefs no later than July 6 at 5:00 p.m., on the issue of irreparable harm outlined above, with simultaneous replies to be filed by noon on July 9. Given the nature of the relief, bond is waived. Signed by District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on July 1, 2012. (SP)
June 29, 2012 Filing 16 Response in Opposition re 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Jackson Women's Health Organization (McDuff, Robert), 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Jackson Women's Health Organization, Willie Parker (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Brewer Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B - Parker Declaration, # 3 Exhibit C - Thompson Declaration, # 4 Exhibit D - Judge Barbour preliminary injunction in Pro-Choice v. Fordice, # 5 Exhibit E - Transcript excerpt of TRO ruling in Hodes v. Moser)(McDuff, Robert) filed by Mary Currier (Bryant, Benjamin)
June 29, 2012 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Robert Shuler Smith (Bryant, Benjamin)
June 29, 2012 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin G. Bryant on behalf of Robert Shuler Smith (Bryant, Benjamin)
June 29, 2012 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by P. Roger Googe, Jr on behalf of Robert Shuler Smith (Googe, P.)
June 29, 2012 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Jackson Women's Health Organization (McDuff, Robert)
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice that Michelle Movahed be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of Jackson Women's Health Organization in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 6/29/12. (JEJ)
June 29, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Status Conference set for June 29, 2012 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III. (SP)
June 29, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III: Status Conference held on June 29, 2012. (SP)
June 28, 2012 Filing 11 MOTION for Michelle Movahed to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jackson Women's Health Organization, Willie Parker (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing - State of Illinois, # 2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing - State of New York)(McDuff, Robert)
June 28, 2012 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Mary Currier (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Exhibit 1-Affidavit of Michael Lucius)(Bryant, Benjamin)
June 28, 2012 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin G. Bryant on behalf of Mary Currier (Bryant, Benjamin)
June 28, 2012 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by P. Roger Googe, Jr on behalf of Mary Currier (Googe, P.)
June 28, 2012 Pro Hac Vice fee paid for Michelle Movahed receipt number 0538-2173277 $ 100 (McDuff, Robert)
June 27, 2012 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jackson Women's Health Organization, Willie Parker identifying Corporate Parent All Women's Jackson, Inc. for Jackson Women's Health Organization. (McDuff, Robert)
June 27, 2012 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Jackson Women's Health Organization, Willie Parker (McDuff, Robert)
June 27, 2012 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Jackson Women's Health Organization, Willie Parker (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Brewer Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B - Parker Declaration, # 3 Exhibit C - Thompson Declaration, # 4 Exhibit D - Judge Barbour preliminary injunction in Pro-Choice v. Fordice, # 5 Exhibit E - Transcript excerpt of TRO ruling in Hodes v. Moser)(McDuff, Robert)
June 27, 2012 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jackson Women's Health Organization, Willie Parker Robert Shuler Smith served on 6/27/2012, answer due 7/18/2012. (McDuff, Robert)
June 27, 2012 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jackson Women's Health Organization Mary Currier served on 6/27/2012, answer due 7/18/2012. (McDuff, Robert)
June 27, 2012 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Mary Currier, Robert Shuler Smith. (cwl)
June 27, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mary Currier, Robert Shuler Smith ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 34643016475), filed by Jackson Women's Health Organization, Willie Parker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - House Bill 1390, # 2 Exhibit B - Politico, April 5, 2012, # 3 Exhibit C - Letter, # 4 Exhibit D - CNN Politics April 4, 2012, # 5 Exhibit E - The Commercial Appeal, April 4, 2012, # 6 Exhibit F - Statement from Lt. Gov. Reeves's Website, # 7 Exhibit G - Letter, # 8 Exhibit H - Letter, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet)(cwl)
June 27, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III: Telephone Conference held on June 27, 2012. (SP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson Women's Health Organization et al v. Currier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackson Women's Health Organization
Represented By: Jenna Gerry - PHV
Represented By: Robert B. McDuff
Represented By: Michelle Nicole Pallak Movahed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Parker
Represented By: Robert B. McDuff
Represented By: Michelle Nicole Pallak Movahed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Currier
Represented By: P. Roger Googe, Jr.
Represented By: Beatryce McCrosky Tolsdorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Shuler Smith
Represented By: P. Roger Googe, Jr.
Represented By: Beatryce McCrosky Tolsdorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara A. Bluntson
Represented By: Claire Barker Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherri M. Flowers-Billlups
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Office of the Governor
Represented By: Jack L. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?