Clinton et al v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: J. Paul Clinton and Stokes and Clinton, P.C.
Defendant: W. Richard Johnson, Sr., David M. Sessums, Varner, Parker & Sessums, P.A. and Tamra Warnock
Counter_claimant: David M. Sessums, Varner, Parker & Sessums, P.A. and W. Richard Johnson, Sr.
Counter_defendant: J. Paul Clinton and Stokes and Clinton, P.C.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00871
Filed: June 15, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Northern (Jackson) Office
County: Warren
Presiding Judge: Michael T. Parker
Presiding Judge: David C. Bramlette
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER denying 155 Motion for Reconsideration Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 11/6/2014 (ECW)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting 94 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 95 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 96 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 103 Motion for Summary Judgment; and dismissing counter-claim as premature. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 9/29/2014 (ECW)
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER denying without prejudice 36 Motion to Dismiss, and allowing Counterclaimants 14 days to amend Counterclaim. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 2/11/2014 (ECW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clinton et al v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Paul Clinton
Represented By: Harry Vincent Satterwhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stokes and Clinton, P.C.
Represented By: Harry Vincent Satterwhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Richard Johnson, Sr.
Represented By: David M. Sessums
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Sessums
Represented By: David M. Sessums
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Varner, Parker & Sessums, P.A.
Represented By: David M. Sessums
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamra Warnock
Represented By: David M. Sessums
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: David M. Sessums
Represented By: David M. Sessums
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Varner, Parker & Sessums, P.A.
Represented By: David M. Sessums
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: W. Richard Johnson, Sr.
Represented By: David M. Sessums
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: J. Paul Clinton
Represented By: Harry Vincent Satterwhite
Represented By: Harry Vincent Satterwhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Stokes and Clinton, P.C.
Represented By: Harry Vincent Satterwhite
Represented By: Harry Vincent Satterwhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?