736 Building Owner, LLC et al v. Regions Bank et al
Plaintiff: |
736 Building Owner, LLC, Cytec Software Systems, Inc. and Oscar De Leon |
Defendant: |
Regions Bank and John and Jane Does 1-5 |
Case Number: |
3:2014cv00222 |
Filed: |
March 17, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi |
Office: |
Northern (Jackson) Office |
County: |
Hinds |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert H. Walker |
Presiding Judge: |
William H. Barbour |
Nature of Suit: |
Negotiable Instrument |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 15, 2016 |
Filing
131
ORDER granting Defendant's 94 Motion for Summary Judgment and finding as moot [110,111,112,115] Motions in Limine. A separate final judgment shall be entered. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on June 15, 2016 (dsl)
|
June 1, 2016 |
Filing
127
ORDER granting Defendant's 93 Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' jury demand and enforce their contractual waivers of trial by jury. Plaintiffs' jury demand is stricken. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on June 1, 2016 (dsl)
|
May 31, 2016 |
Filing
126
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 113 Motion to Intervene. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 5/31/2016 (scp)
|
March 15, 2016 |
Filing
107
ORDER granting 104 Motion to Extend Deadline. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on March 15, 2016. (lda)
|
October 8, 2014 |
Filing
28
ORDER granting 24 Motion to Stay Proceedings; finding as moot 27 Motion to Extend Deadline. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on October 8, 2014. (AA)
|
August 12, 2014 |
Filing
18
ORDER granting 15 Motion to Extend Deadline. The deadline for Regions Bank's Rebuttal in support of its Motion to Dismiss is hereby extended to August 19, 2014. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 8/11/2014 (dtj)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: 736 Building Owner, LLC et al v. Regions Bank et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: 736 Building Owner, LLC |
Represented By: |
David W. Baria |
Represented By: |
Marcie Fyke Baria |
Represented By: |
William P. Featherston, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Robert C. Williamson, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Cytec Software Systems, Inc. |
Represented By: |
David W. Baria |
Represented By: |
Marcie Fyke Baria |
Represented By: |
William P. Featherston, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Robert C. Williamson, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Oscar De Leon |
Represented By: |
David W. Baria |
Represented By: |
Marcie Fyke Baria |
Represented By: |
William P. Featherston, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Robert C. Williamson, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Regions Bank |
Represented By: |
C. Phillip Buffington, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Michael Scott Jones |
Represented By: |
George Robert Parrott, II |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-5 |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?