Precision Spine, Inc. et al v. Zavation, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: |
Precision Spine, Inc. and Spinal USA, INC. |
Defendant: |
Zavation, LLC,, J2 Manufacturing LLC and Jeffrey Johnson |
Case Number: |
3:2015cv00681 |
Filed: |
September 18, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi |
Office: |
Northern (Jackson) Office |
County: |
Rankin |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert H. Walker |
Presiding Judge: |
Louis Guirola |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Personal Property Damage |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 8, 2017 |
Filing
215
ORDER granting 208 Motion to Strike Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 03/08/2017 (Guirola, Louis)
|
March 2, 2016 |
Filing
40
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 22 Motion to Dismiss; denying 22 Motion for More Definite Statement. Plaintiffs are granted ten days to file an amended complaint. Signed by Chief District Judge Louis Guirola, Jr on 03/02/2016 (Guirola, Louis)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Precision Spine, Inc. et al v. Zavation, LLC, et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Precision Spine, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Andrew S. Harris |
Represented By: |
W. Whitaker Rayner |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Spinal USA, INC. |
Represented By: |
Andrew S. Harris |
Represented By: |
W. Whitaker Rayner |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Zavation, LLC, |
Represented By: |
John Adam Crawford, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Robert M. Frey |
Represented By: |
Haley Fowler Gregory |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: J2 Manufacturing LLC |
Represented By: |
John Adam Crawford, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Jeffrey Johnson |
Represented By: |
John Adam Crawford, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Robert M. Frey |
Represented By: |
Haley Fowler Gregory |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?