United States of America et al v. Jackson HMA LLC et al
Plaintiff: W. Blake Vanderlan
Defendant: Jackson HMA LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv00767
Filed: October 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Northern (Jackson) Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: F. Keith Ball
Presiding Judge: Daniel P. Jordan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER terminating 51 Motion to Dismiss; granting 80 Motion to Dismiss for the reasons stated in the Order. Counts I, II, III, V, and VI of the First Amended Complaint are dismissed. The Court instructs Relator to evaluate his interest in purs uing Count IV against Jackson HMA following the Court's rulings. He should therefore file a notice declaring his intent to purse that claim, or abandon it, by January 15, 2021. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on January 5, 2021. (SP)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER denying 83 Motion to Reopen Discovery and to Set Evidentiary Hearing; finding as moot 85 Motion to Suspend Briefing on The United States' Motion to Dismiss; denying 96 Motion to Convert Motions 51 and 80 to Dismiss and Allow Disc overy; granting 108 Motion to Allow Filing of Supplemental Authority as set out in the Order. Relator Vanderlan is directed to respond to the United States' motion to dismiss 80 by May 26, 2020. The United States will then be permitted to file a reply, consistent with the Local Rules. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on May 11, 2020. (SP)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER deferring ruling on 51 Motion to Dismiss; denying 27 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 27 Motion for TRO for the reasons set out in the Order. The Government is given 45 days to make its election going forward, and this case is stayed until further Order of the Court. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on September 14, 2018. (SP)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting 53 Motion to Stay Proceedings Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 12/22/17 (RBM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Jackson HMA LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W. Blake Vanderlan
Represented By: Lance L. Stevens
Represented By: C. Victor Welsh, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson HMA LLC
Represented By: J. William Manuel
Represented By: James Bradley Robertson - PHV
Represented By: Jack W. Selden - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?