United States of America v. Third Coast Towing, LLC et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Third Coast Towing, LLC, Great American Insurance Company and Nature's Way Marine, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv00034
Filed: January 22, 2016
Court: Mississippi Southern District Court
Office: Northern (Jackson) Office
County: Hinds
Referring Judge: F. Keith Ball
Presiding Judge: Carlton W. Reeves
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1319
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2017 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 49 Motion in Limine; denying 55 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 57 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 9/12/2017. (AC)
December 5, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 39 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 12/5/2016. (AC)
August 5, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion to Dismiss; granting 33 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 8/5/2016. (AC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Third Coast Towing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Elise S. Feldman - Federal Gov
Represented By: Sharon Shutler - Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Third Coast Towing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nature's Way Marine, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?