Brady v. Ergon Marine & Industrial Supply, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Brady
Defendant: Ergon Marine & Industrial Supply, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00489
Filed: July 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Office: Northern (Jackson) Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2018 Filing 16 Letter sent to Elissa Mulrooney Coombs, Esq. on July 25, 2018, and Dennis M. O'Bryan, Esq. on July 25, 2018 requesting PHV motion, proposed order and fee. (VM)
July 25, 2018 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of Tennessee Western; Case Number 2:18-cv-02438. Original file, transfer order, and docket sheet received.
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Transfer Venue to the Southern District of Mississippi. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 07/24/2018. (Parker, Thomas) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 7/25/2018.]
July 16, 2018 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Change Venue (proposed order submitted) by Ergon Marine & Industrial Supply, Inc.. (Coombs, Elissa) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 7/25/2018.]
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice to Dennis M. O'Bryan on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 07/12/2018. (Parker, Thomas) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 7/25/2018.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 11 ATTACHMENT of Certificate of Good Standing to #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-2829354) by Michael Brady.. (O'Bryan, Dennis) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 7/25/2018.]
July 11, 2018 Filing 10 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #9 Attachment filed by Michael Brady has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: A certificate from a state bar does not substitute for a certificate of good standing from a District Court. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jae) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 7/25/2018.]
July 11, 2018 Filing 9 ATTACHMENT of Certificate of Good Standing to #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-2829354) by Michael Brady.. (O'Bryan, Dennis) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 7/25/2018.]
July 11, 2018 Filing 8 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-2829354) filed by Michael Brady has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: Local Rule 83.4(c) states applicant must submit two certificates of good standing. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jae) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 7/25/2018.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-2829354) by Michael Brady. (O'Bryan, Dennis) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 7/25/2018.]
June 28, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Ergon Marine & Industrial Supply, Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. 6/28/2018 (jld). [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 7/25/2018.]
June 28, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 7/25/2018.]
June 28, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 7/25/2018.]
June 28, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 7/25/2018.]
June 28, 2018 Filing 2 Judge Thomas L. Parker and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jld) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 7/25/2018.]
June 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY against Ergon Marine & Industrial Supply, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2822620), filed by Michael Brady. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(O'Bryan, Dennis) [Transferred from Tennessee Western on 7/25/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brady v. Ergon Marine & Industrial Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Brady
Represented By: Dennis M. O'Bryan
Represented By: Robert G. Germany
Represented By: Dennis M. O'Bryan - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ergon Marine & Industrial Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Elissa Mulrooney Coombs
Represented By: Elissa Mulrooney *Coombs-TRANSFER ATTORNEY
Represented By: Ernest Lane, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?