Techno Licensing, LLC v. Cellular South, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Techno Licensing, LLC
Defendant: C Spire Wireless, Cellular South, Inc. and C Spire Business Solutions
Case Number: 3:2018cv00581
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Cellular South, Inc. answer due 10/26/2018. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 10/1/18 (RBM)
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Cellular South, Inc. (McDowell, Martin)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Techno Licensing, LLC. Cellular South, Inc. served on 9/5/2018, answer due 9/26/2018. (Dantone, Frank)
August 24, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cellular South, Inc. Summons mailed to Frank John Dantone, Jr., HENDERSON & DANTRONE, PA, P. O. Box 778, Greenville, MS 38702-0778. (LAT)
August 23, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF MAILING OF Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark mailed to the Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office, Alexandria, VA; with docket sheet and complaint attached: Mail Stop 8, Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office, P.O. Box 1450, Alexandria, VA 22313-1450 re #1 Complaint. (LAT)
August 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against C Spire Business Solutions, C Spire Wireless, Cellular South, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number # 0538-3791945), filed by Techno Licensing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit '011 Patent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Techno Licensing, LLC v. Cellular South, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Spire Wireless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cellular South, Inc.
Represented By: Martin Patrick McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Spire Business Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Techno Licensing, LLC
Represented By: Frank John Dantone, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?