Perry v. Jackson HMA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Charles Perry
Defendant: XYZ Corp 1-10, Jackson HMA, LLC and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 3:2018cv00582
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting in part and denying in part #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff has until 10/25/2018 to file a surrebuttal to #4 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. If Plaintiff wishes to file accompanying exhibits under seal, it should be done in accordance with L.U.Civ.R.79. Plaintiff's request for leave to file an amended complaint should be filed as a separate motion and in accordance with L.U.Civ.R.15. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 10/15/2018. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE ON THIS MOTION. (CL)
October 11, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #5 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #12 Memorandum in Support of Motion MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Jackson HMA, LLC (Boykin, Thurman)
October 5, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #5 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #12 Memorandum in Support of Motion , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Charles Perry (Henderson, Sharon)
October 4, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court And Response to Notice of Removal filed by Jackson HMA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Moss Declaration)(Kruger, Stephen)
October 4, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court And Response to Notice of Removal filed by Charles Perry (Attachments: #1 Exhibit sec of state)(Henderson, Sharon)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER regarding #12 Defendant's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss. The Court directs the Clerk to place exhibit [12-1] under restricted access. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 09/27/2018. (CL)
September 27, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #12 : L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings. (KNS)
September 26, 2018 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jackson HMA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Rebuttal Memorandum)(Kruger, Stephen)
September 19, 2018 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Charles Perry (Attachments: #1 Exhibit state law)(Henderson, Sharon)
September 19, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Charles Perry (Henderson, Sharon)
September 18, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #8 . Memoranda in support should be filed separately and shown as a related document to the motion (Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec. 3.A.7). Attorney is directed to file the Memorandum as a separate document and link it to the appropriate document. (ND)
September 18, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #8 : Memoranda in support should be filed separately and shown as a related document to the motion (Court's Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing Sec. 3.A.7). Attorney is directed to file the Memorandum as a separate document and link it to the appropriate document. (KNS)
September 17, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO #4 MOTION to Dismiss Response and Memorandum filed by Charles Perry (Henderson, Sharon)
September 17, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court And Response to Notice of Removal by Charles Perry (Attachments: #1 Exhibit law; statute)(Henderson, Sharon)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #7 Plaintiff's response, which is construed as a motion for extension of time. Plaintiff shall file response on or before 09/17/2018. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 09/07/2018. (CL)
September 7, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Charles Perry (Henderson, Sharon)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER staying telephonic case management conference pending a ruling on the Motion to Dismiss.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 8/24/2018 (WG)
August 23, 2018 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jackson HMA, LLC (Kruger, Stephen)
August 23, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Jackson HMA, LLC (Kruger, Stephen)
August 23, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Thurman L. Boykin, III on behalf of Jackson HMA, LLC (Boykin, Thurman)
August 23, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Jackson HMA, LLC.(Kruger, Stephen)
August 23, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jackson HMA, LLC from Circuit Court of Hinds County, Mississippi, case number 25CI1:18-cv-266-TTG. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid; receipt number 0538-3791878) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Entire State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry v. Jackson HMA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corp 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson HMA, LLC
Represented By: Stephen P. Kruger
Represented By: Thurman L. Boykin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Perry
Represented By: Sharon Denotra Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?