Lenoir et al v. Nissan North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Courtney M. Blake and Willie Mae Lenoir
Defendant: Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc., John Does 1-10, Nissan North America, Inc. and Premise Health Employer Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00607
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Nissan North America, Inc. answer due 11/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 10/26/2018. No further written order will issue. (WG)
October 24, 2018 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Nissan North America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email from Plaintiffs' Counsel)(Brand, Walter)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting unopposed #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complain. Premise Health Employer Solutions, LLC answer due 11/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 10/24/2018. No further written order will issue. (WG)
October 23, 2018 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Premise Health Employer Solutions, LLC (Hawk, Jeremy)
October 23, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #5 , #6 , and #7 : A return on summons should not be filed without the first page, as issued, preceding the return. Attorney is directed to refile. (KNS)
October 22, 2018 Filing 7 ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Willie Mae Lenoir, Courtney M. Blake. Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc. served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. (Bass, Lilli) Modified on 10/23/2018 (KNS).
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Willie Mae Lenoir, Courtney M. Blake. Premise Health Employer Solutions, LLC served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. (Bass, Lilli) Modified on 10/23/2018 (KNS).
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 ***ERROR***DISREGARD THIS ENTRY***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Willie Mae Lenoir, Courtney M. Blake. Nissan North America, Inc. served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. (Bass, Lilli) Modified on 10/23/2018 (KNS).
October 16, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Dale Hawk on behalf of Premise Health Employer Solutions, LLC (Hawk, Jeremy)
October 16, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by LaToya T. Jeter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jeter, LaToya)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Nissan North America, Inc., Premise Health Employer Solutions, LLC, and Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc. (VM)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nissan North America, Inc., Premise Health Employer Solutions, LLC, Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc., and John Does 1-10, (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-3798672), filed by Willie Mae Lenoir and Courtney M. Blake. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lenoir et al v. Nissan North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest Diagnostics Clinical Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Represented By: Walter J. Brand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premise Health Employer Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Jeremy Dale Hawk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney M. Blake
Represented By: Lilli Evans Bass
Represented By: LaToya T. Jeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Mae Lenoir
Represented By: Lilli Evans Bass
Represented By: LaToya T. Jeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?