Moak et al

Plaintiff: Flechas & Associates, P.A., Eduardo A. Flechas and The Flechas Law Firm
Defendant: RMC/CMG Portfolio Holding, LLC as assignee of Cambridge Management Group, LLC, Internal Revenue Service, MCF AF, LLC, Mississippi Department of Revenue, MCS Capital, LLC and WAG, LLC
Appellant: Danny E. Cupit and Bobby Moak
Interested Party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court-Jackson and U.S. Trustee
Trustee: Stephen Smith
Case Number: 3:2018cv00633
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
0 Judge: Tom S Lee
1 Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 Appellant's BRIEF by Danny E. Cupit, Bobby Moak. (Cupit, Danny)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 ATTACHMENT re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal - Record on Appeal, Clerk's Certificate, (Attachments: #1 Part 1(a) Designated Items: Bankruptcy Case 13-03549-ee docket entries as designated in Exhibit A attached to the appellant's amended desigation, #2 Part 1(b), #3 Part 1(c), #4 Part 2(a) Designated Items: Bankruptcy Case 13-03550-ee docket entries as designated in Exhibit A attached to the appellants amended designation, #5 Part 2(b), #6 Part 2(c), #7 Part 3(a) Designated Items: Adversary Case 17-00006-ee docket entries as designated in Exhibit A attached to the appellants amended designation, #8 Part 3(b), #9 Adversary Case 17-00006-ee Docket Sheet, #10 Amended Designation of the Record (Adv. Dkt. 200), #11 Transmittal Letter)(KNS) Modified on 10/23/2018 (KNS).
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 13-03549; Adversary Proceeding No. 17-00006-ee. File received. The docketing of the record on appeal by USDC starts the briefing schedule. Attorneys should refer to Bankruptcy Rule 8018 for all briefing schedules. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 Transmittal Letter)(KNS) Modified on 9/12/2018 (KNS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moak et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flechas & Associates, P.A.
Represented By: R. Michael Bolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo A. Flechas
Represented By: R. Michael Bolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Flechas Law Firm
Represented By: R. Michael Bolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Danny E. Cupit
Represented By: Robert W. Moak
Represented By: Danny E. Cupit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Bobby Moak
Represented By: Robert W. Moak
Represented By: Danny E. Cupit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court-Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RMC/CMG Portfolio Holding, LLC as assignee of Cambridge Management Group, LLC
Represented By: W. Thomas McCraney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Cynthia Lynn Eldridge-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCF AF, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie M. Rippee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Department of Revenue
Represented By: Sylvie Derdeyn Robinson
Represented By: David N. Usry-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCS Capital, LLC
Represented By: Laura M. Glaze
Represented By: Luke Dove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAG, LLC
Represented By: James Eldred Renfroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Stephen Smith
Represented By: Derek A. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?