Waters v. Bailey et al
Plaintiff: Jack Kirby Waters
Defendant: Sheriff Brian Bailey, Sarah Morgan, Capt. Unknown Vaughn, Lt. Unknown Spears, Lt. Unknown Barnett, Paul Mallette, Sergeant Demetri, Amanda Pennington, Vicki Williams, Jessica Courtney, Chad Dixon, Mississippi Correctional Services, Marty Miller and Rankin County District Attorney's Office
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2018cv00647
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Filing 17 Letter from Jack Waters (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (VM) (Main Document 17 replaced on 11/14/2018 to reflect correct Filed Stamp Date) (VM).
November 13, 2018 Filing 16 Change of Address filed by Jack Kirby Waters (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(VM) (Main Document 16 replaced on 11/14/2018 to reflect correct Filed Stamp Date) (VM).
November 9, 2018 Filing 15 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to #14 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct. Mail sent to Plaintiff (VM)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, pro se Plaintiff Jack Kirby Waters' motion #8 for an extension of time and for counsel is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff shall have until November 15, 2018 to comply with the Order #6 . Plaintiff's motion #11 to amend is granted. Plaintiff's motion #13 is granted in part and denied in part. Clerk shall add Sergeant Demetri, Amanda Pennington, Jessica Courtney, Vicki Williams, Marty Miller, Chad Dixon and Rankin County District Attorney's Office as Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 11/1/2018. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS)
October 31, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by Jack Kirby Waters. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(VM)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 10/25/2018. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff and Sheriff Bryan Bailey] (CS)
October 23, 2018 Filing 11 LETTER MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint, by Jack Kirby Waters (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Envelope from Joseph Martin)(MGB)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, if Plaintiff would like his pleading #8 to remain filed, he is directed to place his signature on the document and return it to the Court on or before November 6, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 10/23/2018. [Copy of order and a copy of the Response #8 mailed to Plaintiff] (CS)
October 22, 2018 Filing 9 Letter from Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (VM) (Main Document 9 replaced on 10/23/2018) (KNS). (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/23/2018) (KNS).
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Response to Order [unsigned] re #6 ORDER, Clerk of Court shall add Mississippi Correctional Services as a Defendant. Pro se Plaintiff Jack Kirby Waters shall file a response consistent with this Order no later than October 15, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 10/1/2018. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS) filed by Jack Kirby Waters (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cwl)
October 2, 2018 Filing 7 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #3 Order Opsp2, Acknowledgement filed by Jack Kirby Waters. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(VM)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, Clerk of Court shall add Mississippi Correctional Services as a Defendant. Pro se Plaintiff Jack Kirby Waters shall file a response consistent with this Order no later than October 15, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 10/1/2018. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 09/28/2018. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff and Premier Supply Link] (CS)
September 26, 2018 Filing 4 Letter from Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (VM)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed to Plainitff. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 10/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 09/19/2018. (CS)
September 18, 2018 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jack Kirby Waters (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS)
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brian Bailey, Unknown Barnett, Paul Mallette, Sarah Morgan, Unknown Spears, Unknown Vaughn, filed by Jack Kirby Waters. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Grievance Hearing Report, #2 Exhibit 2 - Sick Call Request, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope, #5 Notice of Assignment)(KNS) (Copies of NEFs and Notice of Assignment mailed to Plaintiff.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waters v. Bailey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Kirby Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Brian Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. Unknown Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Unknown Spears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Unknown Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Mallette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Demetri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Courtney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Correctional Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rankin County District Attorney's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?