Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Inc. et al v. Medworx Home Medical Supplies, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Helmsman Management Services LLC, LM Insurance Corporation, Excelsior Insurance Company, Colorado Casualty Insurance Company, Peerless Insurance Company, Peerless Indemnity Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Wausau Underwriters Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Inc., Liberty Northwest Insurance Corporation, The First Liberty Insurance Corporation, Consolidated Insurance Company, The Netherlands Insurance Company, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company and Employers Insurance Company of Wausau
Defendant: Jane Doe Defendants 1-5, John Doe Defendants 1-5, Medworx Home Medical Supplies, LLC and Daron Walters
Case Number: 3:2018cv00662
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: William H Barbour
Referring Judge: John C Gargiulo
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Helmsman Management Services LLC, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Liberty Northwest Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Inc., Peerless Indemnity Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, The Netherlands Insurance Company, Peerless Insurance Company, The First Liberty Insurance Corporation, Colorado Casualty Insurance Company, Excelsior Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation, Wausau Underwriters Insurance Company, Consolidated Insurance Company.(Rutherford, Kenneth)
October 4, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Colorado Casualty Insurance Company, Consolidated Insurance Company, Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Excelsior Insurance Company, Helmsman Management Services LLC, LM Insurance Corporation, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Inc., Liberty Northwest Insurance Corporation, Peerless Indemnity Insurance Company, Peerless Insurance Company, The First Liberty Insurance Corporation, The Netherlands Insurance Company, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, Wausau Underwriters Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Insurance Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Agency Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. for Colorado Casualty Insurance Company, Consolidated Insurance Company, Excelsior Insurance Company, Liberty Northwest Insurance Corporation, Peerless Indemnity Insurance Company, Peerless Insurance Company, The Netherlands Insurance Company; Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. for Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Helmsman Management Services LLC, LM Insurance Corporation, Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Inc., The First Liberty Insurance Corporation, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, Wausau Underwriters Insurance Company. (Scott, Shea)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER requiring Plaintiffs to file, by October 17, 2018, a response or amended complaint that properly pleads citizenship of limited liability company. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 9/25/2018 (AG)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jane Doe Defendants 1-5, John Doe Defendants 1-5, Medworx Home Medical Supplies, LLC, and Daron Walters ( Filing fee $ 400 paid; receipt number 0538-3816538), filed by Helmsman Management Services LLC, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Liberty Northwest Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Inc., Peerless Indemnity Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Corporation, The Netherlands Insurance Company, Peerless Insurance Company, The First Liberty Insurance Corporation, Colorado Casualty Insurance Company, Excelsior Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, LM Insurance Corporation, Wausau Underwriters Insurance Company, and Consolidated Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Inc. et al v. Medworx Home Medical Supplies, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helmsman Management Services LLC
Represented By: Kenneth A. Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LM Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Kenneth A. Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Excelsior Insurance Company
Represented By: Kenneth A. Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colorado Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Kenneth A. Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peerless Insurance Company
Represented By: Kenneth A. Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peerless Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Kenneth A. Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Kenneth A. Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Kenneth A. Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wausau Underwriters Insurance Company
Represented By: Kenneth A. Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth A. Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Northwest Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Kenneth A. Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The First Liberty Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Kenneth A. Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Consolidated Insurance Company
Represented By: Kenneth A. Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Netherlands Insurance Company
Represented By: Kenneth A. Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Kenneth A. Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Employers Insurance Company of Wausau
Represented By: Kenneth A. Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Defendants 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Defendants 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medworx Home Medical Supplies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daron Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?