Bollen v. Heads et al
Plaintiff: James Bollen
Defendant: American Jet Carrier, Inc., National Continental Insurance Company, Balbir Kaur Hundal, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, John Does 1-10 and Terry Heads
Case Number: 3:2018cv00735
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Remark: Weathers Virden has informed the Court via email on this date that this case has settled. Order of Dismissal to be submitted to District Judge Henry Wingate when paperwork completed. (WG)
December 17, 2018 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against All Defendants, filed by James Bollen.(Greer, Michael)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 12/17/2018 (WG)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER. Plaintiff is directed to file a statement in compliance with L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(10) regarding the #20 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 12/11/2018. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL BE ISSUED BY THE COURT. (WG)
December 11, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Service of Defendants' Disclosure by American Jet Carrier, Inc., Terry Heads, Balbir Kaur Hundal (Moore, James)
December 10, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by James Bollen (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Amended Complaint)(Greer, Michael)
December 10, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by James Bollen (Greer, Michael)
December 10, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by National Continental Insurance Company (Kimmel, Richard)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer American Jet Carrier, Inc. answer due 12/24/2018; and granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Balbir Kaur Hundal answer due 12/24/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 12/03/2018. No further written order will issue from the Court. (WG)
December 3, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by American Jet Carrier, Inc. (Virden, Gregory)
December 3, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Balbir Kaur Hundal (Virden, Gregory)
November 30, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Weathers Virden, Jr on behalf of Terry Heads (Virden, Gregory)
November 28, 2018 Filing 14 Subpoena Returned Executed as to FleetOne, L.L.C.. (Kimmel, Richard)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Terry Heads answer due 12/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 11/16/2018 (WG)
November 16, 2018 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Terry Heads (Moore, James)
November 15, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #7 : L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings. (KNS)
November 14, 2018 Filing 11 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2018 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson (WG)
November 14, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by James Bollen.(Greer, Michael)
November 14, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Bollen. American Jet Carrier, Inc. served on 11/10/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (Greer, Michael)
November 14, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Bollen. Balbir Kaur Hundal served on 11/10/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (Greer, Michael)
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 ATTACHMENT re #6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Exhibit 1 by National Continental Insurance Company, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company (Biggers, Marc)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against James Bollen by Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, National Continental Insurance Company.(Biggers, Marc)
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Bollen. National Continental Insurance Company served on 10/29/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. (Greer, Michael) Modified on 11/6/2018 (KNS).
November 2, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #4 : A return on summons should not be filed without the first page, as issued, preceding the return. Attorney is directed to refile.(PKM)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 **ERROR: Disregard this entry. SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Bollen. National Continental Insurance Company served on 10/29/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. (Greer, Michael) Modified on 11/2/2018 (PKM).
October 30, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Bollen. Terry Heads served on 10/25/2018, answer due 11/15/2018. (Greer, Michael)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 State Court Record by Defendant National Continental Insurance Company (Kimmel, Richard)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by National Continental Insurance Company from Scott County Circuit Court, case number 2018-cv-277-SC-MD. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-3839241) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MGB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bollen v. Heads et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Jet Carrier, Inc.
Represented By: James R. Moore, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory Weathers Virden, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Continental Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard Lee Kimmel
Represented By: Marc A. Biggers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Balbir Kaur Hundal
Represented By: James R. Moore, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory Weathers Virden, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Marc A. Biggers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Heads
Represented By: James R. Moore, Jr.
Represented By: Gregory Weathers Virden, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bollen
Represented By: Michael D. Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?