Langston & Langston, PLLC v. SunTrust Bank et al

Plaintiff: Langston & Langston, PLLC
Defendant: John Does 1-10 and SunTrust Bank
Case Number: 3:2018cv00741
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Filing 6 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2019 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ)
October 31, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by SunTrust Bank.(Salvo, Frederick)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SunTrust Bank identifying Corporate Parent SunTrust Banks, Inc., Corporate Parent SunTrust Bank Holding Company for SunTrust Bank. (Salvo, Frederick)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Lott Warren on behalf of SunTrust Bank (Warren, Joseph)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Shane F. Langston on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Langston, Shane)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SunTrust Bank from Hinds County Circuit Court, MS, case number 18-553. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-3841014) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Langston & Langston, PLLC's 2016 LLC Abual Report, #3 Exhibit C- SunTrust's Annual Registration, #4 Exhibit D- State Court Record, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langston & Langston, PLLC v. SunTrust Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunTrust Bank
Represented By: Frederick N. Salvo, III.
Represented By: Joseph Lott Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Langston & Langston, PLLC
Represented By: Jason L. Nabors
Represented By: Shane F. Langston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?