Wells v. Wal-Greens
Plaintiff: Gloria Wells
Defendant: Wal-Greens Family of Companies
Case Number: 3:2018cv00767
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2018 Filing 13 First NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Request for Production by Gloria Wells (Mumford, Jarrod)
December 31, 2018 Filing 12 First NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Response to Request for Production by Gloria Wells (Mumford, Jarrod)
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 First NOTICE of Service of initial Disclosure by Gloria Wells (Mumford, Jarrod)
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Service of Disclosure by Wal-Greens Family of Companies (Ledford, Leah)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 **ERROR** Disregard this entry. First NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosure by Gloria Wells (Mumford, Jarrod) Modified on 12/20/2018 (VM).
December 19, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #8 and #9 : Incorrect document attached. Attorney is directed to refile and attach the correct pdf document. (VM)
December 19, 2018 Filing 8 **ERROR** Disregard this entry. NOTICE of Service of Disclosure by Wal-Greens Family of Companies (Ledford, Leah) Modified on 12/20/2018 (VM).
December 12, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Wal-Greens Family of Companies (Ledford, Leah)
December 12, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Wal-Greens Family of Companies (Ledford, Leah)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Disclosure due by 12/19/2018 Jury Trial set during a two-week trial period beginning 11/18/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (Jackson) Wingate before District Judge Henry T. Wingate Pretrial Conference set for 10/11/2019 09:00 AM before District Judge Henry T. Wingate Discovery due by 6/4/2019 Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 1/14/2019 Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 1/14/2019 Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 3/6/2019 Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 4/5/2019 Motions due by 6/18/2019 EARLY Settlement Conference set for 3/21/2019 09:00 AM in Chambers 6.150 (Jackson) Anderson before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson ADR Report due by 10/4/2019 Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 12/12/2018 (WG)
December 12, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 12/12/2018. Participants: Jarrod Mumford and Leah Ledford. Case Management Order to be entered. (WG)
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Greens Family of Companies (Ledford, Leah)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Greens Family of Companies.(Ledford, Leah)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2018 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson (WG)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Greens Family of Companies from Circuit Court of Hinds County, Mississippi, case number 18-518. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-3847963) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells v. Wal-Greens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Wells
Represented By: Jarrod D. Mumford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Greens Family of Companies
Represented By: Leah Nichols Ledford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?