Backwater Management, LLC v. Pyron Group, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Backwater Management, LLC
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-5, Nationwide General Insurance Company and Pyron Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00844
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
0 Judge: F Keith Ball
1 Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #13 and #14 Unopposed Motions for Extensions of Time. The plaintiff's reply to remand AND response to sever are due on or before February 15, 2019. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 1/28/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE ON THESE MOTIONS. (AC)
January 25, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Sever by Backwater Management, LLC (Heidelberg, Cecil)
January 25, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 Response in Opposition to Motion by Backwater Management, LLC (Heidelberg, Cecil)
January 22, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven C. Cookston on behalf of Nationwide General Insurance Company (Cookston, Steven)
January 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Sever by Nationwide General Insurance Company (Cookston, Steven)
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Nationwide General Insurance Company (Cookston, Steven)
January 22, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Nationwide General Insurance Company (Cookston, Steven)
January 18, 2019 ***DISREGARD THIS DOCKET ENTRY. ENTERED IN ERROR. Modified on 1/18/2019 (DJ).
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY except for remand-related discovery pending a ruling by the district judge on the Motion to Remand, at docket no. #7 . The telephonic case management conference set for February 7, 2019, is cancelled. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 1/10/2019. (JEJ)
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Backwater Management, LLC (Heidelberg, Cecil)
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand , MOTION to Remand to State Court by Backwater Management, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint and policy, #2 Exhibit B- Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit C- Affidavit of Matthew McLaughlin)(Heidelberg, Cecil)
January 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Supplemental Pleading as to Plaintiff's Membership and Residency by Backwater Management, LLC re #4 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- 2018 Annual Report)(Heidelberg, Cecil)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2019 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 12/26/2018. (AC)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 State Court Record by Defendants Nationwide General Insurance Company, Pyron Group, Inc. Volumes 1 (Tatum, Patrick)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Nationwide General Insurance Company, Pyron Group, Inc..(Tatum, Patrick)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationwide General Insurance Company, Pyron Group, Inc. from Hinds County Circuit Court, MS, case number 25CI1:18-CV-643-WLK. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643052880) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Cameron Farmer, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Backwater Management, LLC v. Pyron Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Backwater Management, LLC
Represented By: Cecil Maison Heidelberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide General Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick Marvin Tatum
Represented By: Steven C. Cookston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pyron Group, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Marvin Tatum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?