McDonald et al v. Trustmark National Bank
Plaintiff: Cryesha McDonald and Chantal Lewis
Defendant: Trustmark National Bank
Case Number: 3:2018cv00852
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting unopposed #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Trustmark National Bank answer due 3/21/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 2/6/19 (RBM)
February 5, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Trustmark National Bank (Bailey, Cody)
January 14, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION for Jeffrey Kaliel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-3892640) filed by Trustmark National Bank (Attachments: #1 Attachment Affidavit of R. David Kaufman)(Kaufman, R.)
January 14, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Jeffrey Kaliel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-3892640) by Chantal Lewis, Cryesha McDonald (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)(Weldy, Christopher)
January 10, 2019 Filing 15 Response in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Sophia Gold to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Chantal Lewis, Cryesha McDonald (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)(Weldy, Christopher) filed by Trustmark National Bank (Attachments: #1 Attachment Affidavit of R. David Kaufman)(Kaufman, R.)
January 10, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Sophia Gold to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Chantal Lewis, Cryesha McDonald (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing)(Weldy, Christopher)
January 10, 2019 Pro Hac Vice fee paid for Sophia Gold receipt number 0538-3890951 $ 100 (Weldy, Christopher)
January 10, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 Response in Opposition to Motion, #9 MOTION to Disqualify Kaliel and Gold filed by Trustmark National Bank (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaints)(Kaufman, R.)
January 3, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #11 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Chantal Lewis, Cryesha McDonald (Weldy, Christopher)
January 3, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Disqualify Kaliel and Gold filed by Chantal Lewis, Cryesha McDonald (Weldy, Christopher)
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Disqualify Kaliel and Gold filed by Trustmark National Bank (Kaufman, R.)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Disqualify Kaliel and Gold by Trustmark National Bank (Kaufman, R.)
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob A. Bradley on behalf of Trustmark National Bank (Bradley, Jacob)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Cody C. Bailey on behalf of All Defendants (Bailey, Cody)
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by William Trey E. Jones, III on behalf of All Defendants (Jones, William Trey)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by R. David Kaufman on behalf of Trustmark National Bank (Kaufman, R.)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Trustmark National Bank answer due 2/19/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 12/20/18 (RBM)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Trustmark National Bank (McDowell, Martin)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cryesha McDonald, Chantal Lewis. Trustmark National Bank served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019. (Weldy, Christopher)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Trustmark National Bank. (ND)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Trustmark National Bank ( Filing fee $ 400 paid; receipt number 34643052941), filed by Cryesha McDonald and Chantal Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonald et al v. Trustmark National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cryesha McDonald
Represented By: Christopher J. Weldy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chantal Lewis
Represented By: Christopher J. Weldy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustmark National Bank
Represented By: Jacob A. Bradley
Represented By: William Trey E. Jones, III
Represented By: Martin Patrick McDowell
Represented By: R. David Kaufman
Represented By: Cody C. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?