Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Gray et al

Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Katonya P. Gray, West Jackson Development Corporation, Mississippi Department of Revenue, John Doe, Richard Roe, Doug Shaddix and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2018cv00871
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 4/1/2019 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah)
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Bridgette T. Thomas-State Gov on behalf of Mississippi Department of Revenue (Thomas-State Gov, Bridgette)
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by United States of America.(Webb-Federal Gov, J.)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to John Doe, Richard Roe. (LAT)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Doug Shaddix on 01/22/2019, filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Drinkwater, William)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Katonya P. Gray. (LAT)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Mississippi Department of Revenue waiver sent on 12/20/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Drinkwater, William)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Doug Shaddix, United States of America. (LAT)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR REFORMATION AND QUIET TITLE against John Doe, Katonya P. Gray, Mississippi Department of Revenue, Richard Roe, Doug Shaddix, United States of America, West Jackson Development Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-3879944), filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Quitclaim Deed from TTLBL, LLC, #2 Exhibit 2- West Jackson Deed, #3 Exhibit 3- Deed of Trust, #4 Exhibit 4- Lien Notice, #5 Exhibit 5- First Tax Deed, #6 Exhibit 6- US Bank Quitclaim, #7 Exhibit 7- West Jackson Quitclaim, #8 Exhibit 8- Notice of Federal Tax Liens, #9 Exhibit 9- MS DOR Notice of Tax Liens, #10 Exhibit 10- Second Tax Deed, #11 Exhibit 11- Lot 31 Chain of Title, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Gray et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katonya P. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Jackson Development Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Department of Revenue
Represented By: Bridgette T. Thomas-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Shaddix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: J. Wesley Webb-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: William W. Drinkwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?