Masters Plan v. D & D Real Estate, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Masters Plan
Defendant: Charles D. Herrington, Dr. Calvin Ramsey, The Department of Treasury of the United States-Internal Revenue Service, Mississippi Department of Revenue, Any and All Individuals Claiming an Interest in the Herein Described Property, D & D Real Estate, LLC and W. Richard Young
Case Number: 3:2018cv00878
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 State Court Record by Defendant The Department of Treasury of the United States-Internal Revenue Service (French-Federal Gov, Keith)
February 11, 2019 NOTICE - Attorney address updated in the attorney database. Updated address: Janace Harvey Goree, GOREE & ASSOCIATES, PLLC, P. O. Box 13301, Jackson, MS 39236. (ND)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable as to #3 Order Staying Case sent to Janace Harvey Goree. (ND)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FUNDING by The Department of Treasury of the United States-Internal Revenue Service (French-Federal Gov, Keith)
January 30, 2019 Remark: Copies of order and NEF mailed: Janace Harvey Goree, WILLIAM F. JORDAN & ASSOCIATES, PLLC, 106 South President St., Suite 300, Jackson, MS 39201 (SAM)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER STAYING CASE Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 1/16/2019. Set STAY and LAPSE flags. (SAM)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #2 Motion to Stay Proceedings. All case management and motion practice deadlines are stayed. Within five days of the government shutdown ending, the parties shall file a motion requesting the stay be lifted. That motion should also contain any requests for extensions necessitated by the shutdown. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 12/28/18 (RBM)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Stay Proceedings in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by The Department of Treasury of the United States-Internal Revenue Service (French-Federal Gov, Keith)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Department of Treasury of the United States-Internal Revenue Service from Chancery Court of Holmes County, Mississippi, case number 18-148. If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Lower Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Masters Plan v. D & D Real Estate, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles D. Herrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Calvin Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Department of Treasury of the United States-Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Keith Bernard French-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Department of Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Any and All Individuals Claiming an Interest in the Herein Described Property
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D & D Real Estate, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Richard Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Masters Plan
Represented By: Janace Harvey Goree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?