Huggins v. Safeguard Properties Management, LLC et al

Plaintiff: George S. Huggins, Jr.
Defendant: Safeguard Properties Management, LLC and Bank of America
Case Number: 3:2018cv00890
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: IT IS ORDERED that this case is hereby dismissed as to all parties. Signed by District Judge Henry T. Wingate on 2/1/19 (LAT)
February 1, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by Safeguard Properties Management, LLC (Glassman, Nathan)
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by George S. Huggins, Jr (Rogers, Paul)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Safeguard Properties Management, LLC.(Glassman, Nathan)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 2/15/2019 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson (WG)
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 ATTACHMENT Entire State Court Record by Safeguard Properties Management, LLC (Glassman, Nathan)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Safeguard Properties Management, LLC (Glassman, Nathan)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Safeguard Properties Management, LLC from County Court of Rankin County, Mississippi, case number 18-2419. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-3883691) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Attachment -County Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huggins v. Safeguard Properties Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeguard Properties Management, LLC
Represented By: Nathan Richard Glassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George S. Huggins, Jr.
Represented By: Paul E. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?