Lewis v. Trans Union, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Rhemalyn Lewis
Defendant: Kay Jewelers, Inc., Trans Union, LLC and Capital One Auto Finance, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00007
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
0 Judge: Linda R Anderson
1 Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Capital One Auto Finance, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Capital One Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate Capital One, N.A. for Capital One Auto Finance, Inc.. (Meyer, Christopher)
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Capital One Auto Finance, Inc..(Meyer, Christopher)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kay Jewelers, Inc. (Masley, Stephen)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Kay Jewelers, Inc. (Masley, Stephen)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kay Jewelers, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Signet Jewelers Limited, Other Affiliate Sterling Jewelers Inc. dba Kay Jewelers, Inc. for Kay Jewelers, Inc.. (Masley, Stephen)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Daniel Meyer on behalf of Capital One Auto Finance, Inc. (Meyer, Christopher)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rhemalyn Lewis. Trans Union, LLC served on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Trewolla, David)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rhemalyn Lewis. Kay Jewelers, Inc. served on 2/8/2019, answer due 3/1/2019. (Trewolla, David)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Trans Union, LLC., Capital One Auto Finance, Inc., and Kay Jewelers, Inc. (VM)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Trans Union, LLC, Capital One Auto Finance, Inc., and Kay Jewelers, Inc., (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-3886831), filed by Rhemalyn Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Trans Union, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kay Jewelers, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen T. Masley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Auto Finance, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhemalyn Lewis
Represented By: David Luke Trewolla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?