Brown v. Lee et al

Plaintiff: Johnny Lee Brown
Defendant: Honorable Mark Duncan, Hon. J. Norman Brown, Coty May, Jody Stewart, Hon. Steven Kilgore, John Does Nos. 11-20, John Doe 1 through John Doe 10, Hon. Will Jones, Officer R. J. Bell, Michael Townsend, Maury Walley, Honorable Christopher Collins, Honorable Vernon Cotten, The Police Department of the City of Forest, Mississippi, Richard Gregory, Hunter Wolf, Nurse Anna Earl, Mike Lee, Officer Tim Rigby, Hon. Jackie Knight, Honorable Bill Freeman and Joshua L. Harrison
Case Number: 3:2019cv00033
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to R. J. Bell, J. Norman Brown, Christopher Collins, Vernon Cotten, Mark Duncan, Bill Freeman, Will Jones, Steven Kilgore, Jackie Knight, Coty May, Tim Rigby, Maury Walley. (KNS)
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joshua L. Harrison. Joshua L. Harrison waiver sent on 3/11/2019, answer due 5/10/2019. (Williams-State Gov, J.)
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Chadwick Williams-State Gov on behalf of Joshua L. Harrison (Williams-State Gov, J.)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Hunter Wolf, Anna Earl. Hunter Wolf waiver sent on 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019; Anna Earl waiver sent on 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Allen, William)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael Townsend, Jody Stewart. Michael Townsend waiver sent on 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019; Jody Stewart waiver sent on 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Allen, William)
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mike Lee, Richard Gregory. Mike Lee waiver sent on 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019; Richard Gregory waiver sent on 2/21/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Allen, William)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 RICO Statement by Johnny Lee Brown (Clanton, Bradley)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 RICO Notice. (KNS)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against R. J. Bell, J. Norman Brown, Christopher Collins, Vernon Cotten, Mark Duncan, Anna Earl, Bill Freeman, Richard Gregory, Joshua L. Harrison, John Doe 1 through John Doe 10, John Does Nos. 11-20, Will Jones, Steven Kilgore, Jackie Knight, Mike Lee, Coty May, Tim Rigby, Jody Stewart, The Police Department of the City of Forest, Mississippi, Michael Townsend, Maury Walley, Hunter Wolf ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-3893541), filed by Johnny Lee Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Lee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honorable Mark Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon. J. Norman Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coty May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jody Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon. Steven Kilgore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does Nos. 11-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1 through John Doe 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon. Will Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer R. J. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maury Walley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honorable Christopher Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honorable Vernon Cotten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Police Department of the City of Forest, Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunter Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Anna Earl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Tim Rigby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon. Jackie Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honorable Bill Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua L. Harrison
Represented By: J. Chadwick Williams-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Lee Brown
Represented By: Bradley S. Clanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?