Meridith v. Sollie et al

Plaintiff: Michael Deon Meridith
Defendant: Latoya Bennett, Lauderdale County Detention Facility, Billie Sollie and Lauderdale County, Mississippi
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2019cv00040
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
0 Judge: Tom S Lee
1 Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Sheriff Billy Sollie, Latoya Bennett and Lauderdale County, Mississippi on 03/04/2019. Waiver of Service due by 4/4/2019. (CS)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, Clerk is directed to issue a Notice of Lawsuit for Defendants. The Defendants are directed to file a signed Waiver form within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 03/04/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (Attachments: #1 Notice of Lawsuit, #2 Waiver of Service) (CS)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER : Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the court construes plaintiffs attachment #9 as his signed response to the courts order #8 entered on February 4, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs request to voluntarily dismiss defendant Lauderdale County Detention Facility is granted. See Pl.s Resp. #9 at 1. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs request to add Lauderdale County, Mississippi, as a defendant is granted. SeePl.s Resp. #9 at 1. Signed by District Judge Tom S. Lee on 3/1/19 (LAT)
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 ATTACHMENT re #7 Response to Order, by Michael Deon Meridith. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(LAT)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Plaintiff is directed to place his original signature on page 2 of the Response #7 and return the Response #7 with the original signature to the Court on or before February 26, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 02/04/2019. [Copy of Order and Response #7 mailed to Plaintiff] (CS)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Response to Order re #6 ORDER, on or before February 20, 2019, Plaintiff shall file a written response consistent with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 01/28/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS) filed by Michael Deon Meridith. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, on or before February 20, 2019, Plaintiff shall file a written response consistent with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 01/28/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 01/28/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff and Authorized Officer for Inmate Accounts, Lauderdale County Detention Facility] (CS)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #3 Order Opsp2, Acknowledgement filed by Michael Deon Meridith. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed to Plaintiff. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 2/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 01/17/2019. (CS)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Michael Deon Meridith. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Latoya Bennett, Lauderdale County Detention Facility, Billie Sollie, filed by Michael Deon Meridith. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment)(NEFs and notice of assignment mailed to Plaintiff's last known address).(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meridith v. Sollie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latoya Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauderdale County Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billie Sollie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauderdale County, Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Deon Meridith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?