Asbury Automotive Group, Inc. et al v. Gooding
Plaintiff: Asbury MS Chevrolet LLC and Asbury Automotive Group, Inc.
Defendant: Ronald Edward Gooding
Case Number: 3:2019cv00041
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(5) for insufficient service of process MOTION to Quash Service of Process filed by Ronald Edward Gooding (Dillard, Joel)
March 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(5) for insufficient service of process, MOTION to Quash Service of Process by Ronald Edward Gooding (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Email asking about service, #2 Exhibit 2: Email sending Complaint and Summons, #3 Exhibit 3: Email agreeing to accept Complaint and Summons by email)(Dillard, Joel)
March 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel F. Dillard on behalf of Ronald Edward Gooding (Dillard, Joel)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Ronald Edward Gooding answer due 3/18/2019. NO WRITTEN ORDER TO FOLLOW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 2/25/2019. (ACF)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Ronald Edward Gooding. (LAT)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Asbury Automotive Group, Inc., Asbury MS Chevrolet LLC. Ronald Edward Gooding served on 1/25/2019, answer due 2/15/2019. (McCharen, Silas)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ronald Edward Gooding. (LAT)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ronald Edward Gooding ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643053365), filed by Asbury Automotive Group, Inc., Asbury MS Chevrolet LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Social Media Pages, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asbury Automotive Group, Inc. et al v. Gooding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asbury MS Chevrolet LLC
Represented By: Silas W. McCharen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asbury Automotive Group, Inc.
Represented By: Silas W. McCharen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Edward Gooding
Represented By: Joel F. Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?