McKinney v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Andrae Myron McKinney
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00104
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 RESET Hearing: Telephonic Case Management Conference reset for 5/2/2019 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. ( (JEJ)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #11 Motion to Continue Telephonic Case Management Conference and related deadlines. The TCMC scheduled for 4/4/2019 03:00 PM is continued until a future date. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 3/28/19 (RBM)
March 27, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Continue the Case Management Conference, Extension of Rule 16 Deadlines and Other Relief by Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union LLC (Henson, Finisse)
March 26, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union LLC, filed by Andrae Myron McKinney.(Kittell, Christopher)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AGREED ORDER granting #5 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 3/21/19 (RBM) (Main Document 9 replaced on 3/21/2019) (KNS).
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 3/27/2019; Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 3/27/2019; Trans Union LLC answer due 3/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 3/6/19 (RBM)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Henson, Finisse)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 4/4/2019 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (JEJ)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Henson, Finisse)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Equifax Information Services, LLC answer due 3/6/2019; Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 3/6/2019; Trans Union LLC answer due 3/6/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 2/14/19 (RBM)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian Information Solutions, Inc. for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Henson, Finisse)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Henson, Finisse)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union LLC (Driskell, Mitchell)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Trans Union LLC from Hinds County Circuit Court, MS, First Judicial District, case number 25CI1:18-cv-609-WLK. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643053631) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Joinder and Consents to Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Attachment)(KNS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKinney v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Finisse Ewin Henson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Finisse Ewin Henson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Mitchell O. Driskell, III
Represented By: Finisse Ewin Henson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrae Myron McKinney
Represented By: Christopher E. Kittell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?