McMullin v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Kenya McMullin
Defendant: Jackson HMA, LLC, Dr. Samuel Brown and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00112
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 NOTICE of cancellation. The TCMC set for Monday, April 1, 2019 is cancelled. (Lewis, Nijah)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER of DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: All claims against the United States of America shall be dismissed without prejudice. The United States of America shall be dismissed from this action. Signed by District Judge Henry T. Wingate on 3/8/2019 (ND)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #2 Motion to Substitute Party as per Stipulation #7 filed by the parties. The Clerk is directed to edit the docket to substitute the United States of America for defendant Dr. Samuel Brown. The name of the case shall be altered to reflect that revision. NO WRITTEN ORDER TO FOLLOW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 2/25/2019. (ACF)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Kenya McMullin (Morrison, Walter)
February 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen P. Kruger on behalf of Jackson HMA, LLC (Kruger, Stephen)
February 18, 2019 Filing 5 Joinder in Document by Jackson HMA, LLC to #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Samuel Brown (Chapman, John)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 4/1/2019 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Samuel Brown (Case-Federal Gov, Jennifer)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Substitute Party by Samuel Brown (Case-Federal Gov, Jennifer)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Samuel Brown from Circuit Court of Hinds County, MS, case number 25CI1:18-cv-348-WLK. If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 State Court Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMullin v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson HMA, LLC
Represented By: Stephen P. Kruger
Represented By: John W. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Samuel Brown
Represented By: Jennifer Case-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Jennifer Case-Federal Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenya McMullin
Represented By: Walter C. Morrison, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?