Smith v. Ladner et al

Plaintiff: Charles Smith, Jr.
Defendant: James Fillyaw, William Moody, Deputy Warden Vivian Frazier, Franks, Warden Brian Ladner and Unknown Hampton
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2019cv00243
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Brian Ladner, Warden; Vivian Frazier, Deputy Warden; William Moody, Security Officer; Unknown Hampton, Security Officer; James Fillyaw, Warden, and Unknown Franks, Lieutenant on 6/28/2019. Waiver of Service due by 7/28/2019. (LDR)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, the Clerk of Court is directed to issue a Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons for Defendants Brian Ladner, Warden; Vivian Frazier, Deputy Warden; William Moody, Security Officer; Unknown Hampton, Security Officer; James Fillyaw, Warden, and Unknown Franks, Lieutenant. The Defendants are directed to file a signed Waiver form or a Response, within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 6/28/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to plaintiff] (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons - Brian Ladner, Warden; Vivian Frazier, Deputy Warden; William Moody, Security Officer; Unknown Hampton, Security Officer; James Fillyaw, Warden, and Unknown Franks, Lieutenant, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(LDR)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 Response to Order re #9 ORDER filed by Charles Smith, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(KNS)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, on or before June 28, 2019, Plaintiff must file a written response consistent with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 6/6/19, [Copy mailed to plaintiff] (LDR)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in order.; *RESTRICTED* granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 6/6/2019. [Copy mailed to plaintiff and Premier Supply Link] (LDR)
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 AUTHORIZATION FOR RELEASE OF ACCOUNT INFORMATION AND CERTIFICATE by Charles Smith, Jr (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(cwl)
April 25, 2019 Filing 6 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Charles Smith, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(KNS)
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 as to #3 Order Opsp2, Acknowledgement filed by Charles Smith, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER, on or before May 9, 2019, plaintiff shall either pay the required filing fee or file a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, specifically the section entitled Certificate to Be Completed by Authorized Officer of prisoner accounts or file an affidavit specifically stating the name of the prison official contacted concerning the Certificate and why this information is not provided to this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 4/9/19. [Copy mailed to plaintiff] (LDR)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 5/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 4/9/2019. [Copy mailed to plaintiff] (LDR)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Charles Smith, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(KNS)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James Fillyaw, Franks, Vivian Frazier, Unknown Hampton, Brian Ladner, William Moody, filed by Charles Smith, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Notice of Assignment, #4 Cover Letter) (KNS) (nefs and Notice of Assignment mailed to Plaintiff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Ladner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Fillyaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Warden Vivian Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Brian Ladner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?