U.S. Bank National Association et al v. McMullan
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association and USB Leasing LT
Defendant: Brennan McMullan
Case Number: 3:2019cv00249
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #8 Response in Opposition, to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by U.S. Bank National Association, USB Leasing LT (Smith, Brian)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 Response in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss by Brennan McMullan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Clerk's Motion to Dismiss)(Tullos, Raymond) Modified on 6/13/2019 (VM). filed by U.S. Bank National Association, USB Leasing LT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Defs Answer to Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Clerk Order Dismissing Case for Want of Prosecution)(Smith, Brian)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Brennan McMullan.(Tullos, Raymond)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 7/25/2019 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e-mail to anderson_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call; and once all parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4440. (Lewis, Nijah)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Brennan McMullan.(Tullos, Raymond)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Brennan McMullan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint , #2 Exhibit B - Clerk's Motion to Dismiss)(Tullos, Raymond) Modified on 6/13/2019 (VM).
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Bank National Association. Brennan McMullan served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. (Smith, Brian)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Brennan McMullan. (VM)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT against Brennan McMullan (Filing fee $400 receipt number 34643054420), filed by U.S. Bank National Association, USB Leasing LT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Purchase Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Retail Installment Contract, #3 Exhibit 3 - Application for Certificate of Title, #4 Exhibit 4 - Consumer Credit Contract, #5 Exhibit 5 - Consumer Security Agreement, #6 Exhibit 6 - Manufactured Housing Credit Application, #7 Exhibit 7 - Purchase Agreement and Bill of Sale, #8 Exhibit 8 - Disbursement check, #9 Exhibit 9 - Certificate of Title, #10 Exhibit 10 - Replacement Certificate of Title, #11 Exhibit 11 - Nov. 16, 2018 demand letter, #12 Exhibit 12 - Nov. 26, 2018 letter, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM) (Attachment 4 replaced on 4/11/2019) (VM). (Attachment 5 replaced on 4/11/2019) (VM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association et al v. McMullan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brennan McMullan
Represented By: Raymond P. Tullos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Brian C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USB Leasing LT
Represented By: Brian C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?