Battery Conservation Innovations, LLC v. Skyhawke Technologies, LLC

Plaintiff: Battery Conservation Innovations, LLC
Defendant: Skyhawke Technologies, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00327
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Battery Conservation Innovations, LLC. (McDavid, Stephan)
June 4, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #5 : A return on summons should not be filed without the first page, as issued, preceding the return. Attorney is directed to refile. (VM)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Battery Conservation Innovations, LLC. Skyhawke Technologies, LLC served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (McDavid, Stephan)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Jay Johnson be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of the plaintiff in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 5/13/2019. (JEJ)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Jay Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-3984944) by Battery Conservation Innovations, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Certificates of Good Standing (TX, OK, and CO))(McDavid, Stephan)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Skyhawke Technologies, LLC. (VM)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF MAILING OF Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark re #1 Complaint. (VM)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Jury Trial Demanded against Skyhawke Technologies, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-3984483), filed by Battery Conservation Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Patent)(VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Battery Conservation Innovations, LLC v. Skyhawke Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Battery Conservation Innovations, LLC
Represented By: Stephan L. McDavid
Represented By: Jay B. Johnson - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skyhawke Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?