Avila-Bravo et al v. Nixon et al

Plaintiff: Rocio Sandoval-Canales and Jovany Avila-Bravo
Defendant: John Does 1-10, Greyhound Lines, Incorporated and Erika L. Nixon
Case Number: 3:2019cv00347
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER terminating #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER TO ISSUE FROM THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 6/25/19 (RBM)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER of Consolidation. The Court concludes that consolidation of these seven cases is proper pursuant to Fed. R. Civ P. 42. All future filings in these cases shall be made in the lead case, Civil Action No. 3:19-cv-225-DPJ-FKB. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 6/20/19 (MGB)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Erika L. Nixon (Thompson, Robert)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE by Greyhound Lines, Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Motion to Consolidate, Memorandum in Support and Supplemental Motion to Consolidate)(Smith, Margaret)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 State Court Record by Defendant Greyhound Lines, Incorporated (Smith, Margaret)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by George Clanton Gunn, IV on behalf of Greyhound Lines, Incorporated (Gunn, George)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Greyhound Lines, Incorporated (Smith, Margaret)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Greyhound Lines, Incorporated from Circuit Court of Hinds County, Mississippi, case number 19-299. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0538-3991699) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(VM) Modified on 5/16/2019 (VM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avila-Bravo et al v. Nixon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greyhound Lines, Incorporated
Represented By: Margaret Z. Smith
Represented By: George Clanton Gunn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erika L. Nixon
Represented By: Robert P. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocio Sandoval-Canales
Represented By: Seth C. Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jovany Avila-Bravo
Represented By: Seth C. Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?