Geans v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Tony Geans
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: SSA General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2019cv00368
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: John C Gargiulo
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Tony Geans. All Defendants. Service made upon: U S Attorney; U S Attorney General; Commissioner of SSA. (Clark, Ricky)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (ND)
June 17, 2019 Filing fee PAID: $ 400.00, receipt number 34643055259. (ND)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER requiring answer and briefing. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 5/30/2019 (AG)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 5/30/2019 (AG)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Tony Geans. (Attachments: #1 IFP Long Form)(ND)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Tony Geans. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geans v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Geans
Represented By: Ricky Brian Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?