McLemore et al v. Hosemann et al
Plaintiff: Leslie-Burl McLemore, Jimmie Robinson, Sr., Charles Holmes and Roderick Woullard
Defendant: Delbert Hosemann and Phillip Gunn
Case Number: 3:2019cv00383
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY pursuant to L.U.Civ.R. 16(b)(3)(B) pending a decision on the Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Immunity at docket no. #18 . No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 7/16/2019. (JEJ)
July 15, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Immunity filed by Phillip Gunn, Delbert Hosemann (Jones, William Trey)
July 15, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Immunity by Phillip Gunn, Delbert Hosemann (Jones, William Trey)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting in part #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint and #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction as set out in the Order. Defendants are hereby ordered to file their response to the complaint by July 15, 2019, and their response to the preliminary-injunction motion by July 29, 2019. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on June 20, 2019. (SP)
June 20, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth L. Orlansky on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Orlansky, Beth)
June 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob A. Bradley on behalf of Phillip Gunn, Delbert Hosemann (Bradley, Jacob)
June 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Cody C. Bailey on behalf of Phillip Gunn, Delbert Hosemann (Bailey, Cody)
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Charles Holmes, Leslie-Burl McLemore, Jimmie Robinson, Sr, Roderick Woullard (Nkwonta - PHV, Uzoma)
June 18, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Phillip Gunn, Delbert Hosemann (Jones, William Trey)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. That Jacki Anderson, Marc E. Elias, Uzoma N. Nkwonta, Daniel C. Osher and K'Shaani O. Smith be admitted pro hac vice in this case on behalf of the plaintiffs in association with local counsel and upon registration for electronic filing as required by the Court. No further written order shall issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 6/10/2019. (JEJ)
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leslie-Burl McLemore, Charles Holmes, Roderick Woullard, Jimmie Robinson, Sr. Phillip Gunn served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (McDuff, Robert)
May 31, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leslie-Burl McLemore, Charles Holmes, Roderick Woullard, Jimmie Robinson, Sr. Delbert Hosemann served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (McDuff, Robert)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Charles Holmes, Leslie-Burl McLemore, Jimmie Robinson, Sr, Roderick Woullard (McDuff, Robert)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Charles Holmes, Leslie-Burl McLemore, Jimmie Robinson, Sr, Roderick Woullard (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1, Riser Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex 2, MS Encyclopedia article on segregation, #3 Exhibit Ex 3, Mabry article on Black disfranchisement, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4, Elections Committee proceedings, 1890 Const Convention, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5, McDonald article on majority vote requirements, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6, Morton article on majority vote requirements, #7 Exhibit Ex 7, Rodden declaration, #8 Exhibit Ex 8, 2015 election results, #9 Exhibit Ex 9, Article on MS educ inequity, #10 Exhibit Ex 10, Tuskegee report on lynching, #11 Exhibit Ex 11, USA Today article on McDaniel statements, #12 Exhibit Ex 12, DJ article on Hyde-Smith statements, #13 Exhibit Ex 13, The Hill article on statement about Espy, #14 Exhibit Ex 14, AP article on minority presence in legislatures, #15 Exhibit Ex 15, CL article on Black elected officials in MS)(McDuff, Robert)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for K'Shaani O. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4000843) by Charles Holmes, Leslie-Burl McLemore, Jimmie Robinson, Sr, Roderick Woullard (Attachments: #1 Attachment Client Information Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(McDuff, Robert)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Daniel C. Osher to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4000838) by Charles Holmes, Leslie-Burl McLemore, Jimmie Robinson, Sr, Roderick Woullard (Attachments: #1 Attachment Client Information Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(McDuff, Robert)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Uzoma N. Nkwonta to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4000825) by Charles Holmes, Leslie-Burl McLemore, Jimmie Robinson, Sr, Roderick Woullard (Attachments: #1 Attachment Client Information Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(McDuff, Robert)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Marc E. Elias to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4000806) by Charles Holmes, Leslie-Burl McLemore, Jimmie Robinson, Sr, Roderick Woullard (Attachments: #1 Attachment Client Information Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(McDuff, Robert)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Jacki Anderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0538-4000779) by Charles Holmes, Leslie-Burl McLemore, Jimmie Robinson, Sr, Roderick Woullard (Attachments: #1 Attachment Client Information Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(McDuff, Robert)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Phillip Gunn, Delbert Hosemann. (KNS)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DECLARATORY RELIEF against Phillip Gunn, Delbert Hosemann ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4000191), filed by Leslie-Burl McLemore, Charles Holmes, Roderick Woullard, Jimmie Robinson, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KNS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McLemore et al v. Hosemann et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie-Burl McLemore
Represented By: Robert B. McDuff
Represented By: Marc Elias - PHV
Represented By: Uzoma Nkwonta - PHV
Represented By: Jacki Anderson - PHV
Represented By: Daniel C. Osher - PHV
Represented By: Beth L. Orlansky
Represented By: K'Shaani O. Smith - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmie Robinson, Sr.
Represented By: Robert B. McDuff
Represented By: Marc Elias - PHV
Represented By: Uzoma Nkwonta - PHV
Represented By: Jacki Anderson - PHV
Represented By: Daniel C. Osher - PHV
Represented By: Beth L. Orlansky
Represented By: K'Shaani O. Smith - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Holmes
Represented By: Robert B. McDuff
Represented By: Marc Elias - PHV
Represented By: Uzoma Nkwonta - PHV
Represented By: Jacki Anderson - PHV
Represented By: Daniel C. Osher - PHV
Represented By: Beth L. Orlansky
Represented By: K'Shaani O. Smith - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roderick Woullard
Represented By: Robert B. McDuff
Represented By: Marc Elias - PHV
Represented By: Uzoma Nkwonta - PHV
Represented By: Jacki Anderson - PHV
Represented By: Daniel C. Osher - PHV
Represented By: Beth L. Orlansky
Represented By: K'Shaani O. Smith - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delbert Hosemann
Represented By: Jacob A. Bradley
Represented By: William Trey E. Jones, III
Represented By: Cody C. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Gunn
Represented By: Jacob A. Bradley
Represented By: William Trey E. Jones, III
Represented By: Cody C. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?