Cole v. Billie Sollie
Plaintiff: Shantrail Cole
Defendant: Sheriff Billie Sollie
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2019cv00390
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Henry T Wingate
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, on or before August 5, 2019, pro se Plaintiff Shantrail Cole shall file a written response showing cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to obey an Order #3 of the Court. Show Cause Response due by 8/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 07/22/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff] (CS)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed to Plaintiff. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 7/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 06/04/2019. (CS)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Shantrail Cole. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Billie Sollie, filed by Shantrail Cole. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Evidence from cell and shower, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope, #4 Notice of Assignment)(NEFs and notice of assignment forwarded to Plaintiff's current address via USPS mail.)(LAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cole v. Billie Sollie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Billie Sollie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shantrail Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?