Alexander v. Hall
Petitioner: John Peyton Alexander, II
Respondent: Pelicia Hall
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2019cv00398
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 COPY OF NOTIFICATION/LETTER from USCA, Fifth Circuit to John Peyton Alexander, II re order transferring case. (Attachments: #1 copy of Order of Transfer) (KNS)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1631 - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Petition #1 should be and is hereby transferred to the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Clerk of Court shall close this case pending the decision of the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 7/23/2019 (ND)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Certification of Constitutional Question, MOTION to Change Venue (Transfer) to the Supreme Court of the U.S. by John Peyton Alexander, II (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Notice of Motion, #3 Envelope)(cwl)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by John Peyton Alexander, II. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(ND)
June 12, 2019 Filing fee PAID: $ 5.00, receipt number 34643055204. (ND)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER, on or before July 10, 2019, petitioner shall complete and file the attached application or pay the $5.00 filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 6/10/2019. [Copy mailed to petitioner] (LDR)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by John Peyton Alexander, II. (Attachments: #1 Appendices, #2 Envelope)(ND)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by John Peyton Alexander, II. (Attachments: #1 Appendices, #2 Inmate Bank W/D Form, #3 Cover Letter, #4 Envelope, #5 Notice of Assignment)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander v. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pelicia Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Peyton Alexander, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?