Helena Agri-Enterprises, LLC v. Westbank Farms Partnership et al
Plaintiff: Helena Agri-Enterprises, LLC
Defendant: Westbank Farms Partnership and Jeffrey D. Parkinson
Case Number: 3:2019cv00403
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: F Keith Ball
Referring Judge: Carlton W Reeves
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint, by Jeffrey D. Parkinson, Westbank Farms Partnership.(Heck, Taylor)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Lamar, III on behalf of Jeffrey D. Parkinson, Westbank Farms Partnership (Lamar, John)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Helena Agri-Enterprises, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Marubeni America Corporation for Helena Agri-Enterprises, LLC. (Spencer, Jimmy)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Helena Agri-Enterprises, LLC. Jeffrey D. Parkinson served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Spencer, Jimmy)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Helena Agri-Enterprises, LLC. Westbank Farms Partnership served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Spencer, Jimmy)
June 18, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #4 : L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) requires that all supporting exhibits to a document be denominated by an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney is advised to follow this rule in future filings (KNS)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jeffrey D. Parkinson, Westbank Farms Partnership, filed by Helena Agri-Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Spencer, Jimmy)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER instructing plaintiff to submit a supplemental pleading establishing LLC membership. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 6/13/2019. (CL)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jeffrey D. Parkinson and Westbank Farms Partnership. (ND)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jeffrey D. Parkinson and Westbank Farms Partnership ( Filing fee $ 400 paid, receipt number 0538-4008339) filed by Helena Agri-Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Credit Sales Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Note, #3 Exhibit C - Demand Letter, #4 Exhibit D - Guaranty Agreement, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ND)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Helena Agri-Enterprises, LLC v. Westbank Farms Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helena Agri-Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Jimmy Fred Spencer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westbank Farms Partnership
Represented By: Taylor Allison Heck
Represented By: John Thomas Lamar, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey D. Parkinson
Represented By: Taylor Allison Heck
Represented By: John Thomas Lamar, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?