Jackson v. Turner
Plaintiff: Roger Lee Jackson
Defendant: Marshal Unknown Turner
Interested Party: Pro Se Department
Case Number: 3:2019cv00409
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Linda R Anderson
Referring Judge: Tom S Lee
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Unknown Turner (Burch-State Gov, Emily)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Unknown Turner served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/14/2019. (VM)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER *RESTRICTED* granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Respondent Marshal Turner, through Jim Hood, shall file an answer or other responsive pleading in this cause within twenty (20) days of the service upon the said Jim Hood of a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 7/24/2019. [Copy of Order mailed to petitioner] (LDR)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Roger Lee Jackson. (VM)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Roger Lee Jackson. (Attachment: #1 Notice of Assignment) (VM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Lee Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshal Unknown Turner
Represented By: Jim Hood-State Gov
Represented By: Emily H. Burch-State Gov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Pro Se Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?