Montgomery v. PetSmart, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Yvita Montgomery
Defendant: John Does 1-10, XYZ Corporations 1-10 and PetSmart, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00410
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Tom S Lee
Referring Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF Receipt filed as to Hon. Zack Wallace, Hinds County Circuit Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LAT) (Main Document 11 replaced on 7/15/2019) (LAT).
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from Arthur Johnston, Clerk to Hon. Zack Wallace, Hinds County Circuit Court Clerk, transmitting certified copies of Order to Remand and docket sheet. (LAT)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Remand. Signed by District Judge Tom S. Lee on 7/9/19 (LAT)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Yvita Montgomery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit COMPLIANTS)(Yates, Shanda)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand filed by PetSmart, Inc. (Stevens, Scott)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER Cancelling Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2019 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 6/18/2019 (SR)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 6/18/2019. (SR)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by Yvita Montgomery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FILED PROOF OF SERVICE)(Yates, Shanda)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2019 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker. (SR)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PetSmart, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Petsmart, Inc. for PetSmart, Inc.. (Stevens, Scott)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by PetSmart, Inc. (LAT)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with JURY DEMAND by PetSmart, Inc. from Hinds County Circuit Court, MS, case number 19-268. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4011661) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAT) (Main Document 1 replaced on 6/13/2019) (LAT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montgomery v. PetSmart, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PetSmart, Inc.
Represented By: Scott D. Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvita Montgomery
Represented By: Shanda M. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?